Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Te Atiawa ki te Upoko o Te Ika a Maui Potiki Trust
CC38312
9429043037896
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
September 30

Address for service

PO Box 4046
Marewa
Napier
4143
9 Park Road
Miramar
Wellington
6022

Charity's other details

022 153 6898


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

Marae, Affiliation with iwi and/or hapū, Focuses on outcomes for Māori, Ownership

Group Members


Below are all the members of Te Atiawa ki te Upoko o te Ika a Maui Potiki Trust Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Atiawa Nui Tonu Fisheries Limited
Te Atiawa ki te Upoko o Te Ika a Maui Potiki Trust

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To receive, hold, manage and administer the Trust fund for every charitable purpose benefiting Te Atiawa ki te Upoko o te Ika a Maui whether it relates to the relief of poverty, the advancement of education or religion or any other matters beneficial to the community of Te Atiawa ki te Upoko o Te Ika.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Sponsors / undertakes research

Marae on reservation land

Environment / conservation, Community development, Economic development, Customary Fisheries

People of a certain ethnic / racial origin

Children / young people, Family / whanau, Marae

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Anaru Adams Chairperson 5/02/2024
Matthew Tamati Reweti Deputy Chairperson 4/02/2024
Anania Randall Trustee 9/03/2014
Peter John Anaru Reweti Trustee 10/11/2007
Ihaia Puketapu Trustee 19/11/2006

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Anaru Adams Chairperson 2/04/2024
Te Rira Puketapu Trustee 6/05/2023
Morris Te Whiti Love Trustee 31/03/2020
Paraire Hawea Tomoana Trustee 29/04/2015
John Ngatiawa Warren Chairman 23/02/2014
Wayne Thomas Mulligan Trustee 25/03/2012
Anania Wiremu Randall Deputy Chairman 15/11/2009
Joanne Mabell Korent Trustee 15/11/2009

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
5/02/2024 NOC016
29/03/2021 NOC012
22/05/2020 NOC010
19/02/2020 NOC007
25/03/2013 NOC001
15/02/2010 AR002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.