Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Raukura Whare Limited
CC43074
9429038380235
Registered

Registration details

4/09/2008
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 19295
Hamilton
3244
6 Bryce Street
Hamilton Central
Hamilton
3204

Charity's other details

07 834 4880


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

Affiliation with iwi and/or hapū, Ownership

Group Members


Below are all the members of Waikato Raupatu Lands Trust and Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Raukura Moana Seafoods Limited
Raukura Whare Limited
Ruakura Port Limited
Tainui Group Holdings Limited
TDL No 2 Limited
TDL No.1 Limited
TDL NO.3 LIMITED
Te Whakakitenga O Waikato Incorporated
TGH Asset Holdco Limited
Waikato Raupatu Lands Trust
loading image for pagination

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To undertake activities and operations so as to further the charitable purposes of the Waikato Raupatu Lands Trust or any other Charitable Body.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Provides a dividend to the shareholder)

Other (please state)

(Investment), Economic development

Other (please state)

(Other beneficiaries/Waikato Tainui beneficiaries)

Legal Structure

Company

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Maxine Sheree Graham Director 29/05/2024
Hinerangi Ada Raumati-Tu'ua Director 17/05/2024
Huirama Paimarire Matatahi Director 17/05/2024

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Donald Aminiasi Tangi Paul Turner Director 17/05/2024
Rangitamoana Wilson Director 17/05/2024
Vanessa Ngaroimata Clark Director 17/05/2024
Denis Te Wakatoto Holland Director 17/08/2022
Maungarongo Tito Director 17/08/2022
Charles Joe Trustee 12/02/2012
Robert Tukiri Trustee 12/02/2012
Taitimu Maipi Trustee 12/02/2012
Hemi Rau Trustee 21/05/2010
Hinerangi Ada Raumati Director 14/10/2009
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
27/05/2024 NOC020
22/08/2022 NOC017
9/07/2015 NOC009
23/06/2015 NOC008
23/06/2015 NOC007
5/10/2012 NOC003
25/09/2012 AR005
8/11/2010 AR003
13/05/2010 NOC002
9/04/2010 AR002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.