Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


TDL No.1 Limited
CC43090
9429032108934
Registered

Registration details

7/08/2009
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 19295
Hamilton
3244
6 Bryce Street
Hamilton Central
Hamilton
3204

Charity's other details

07 834 7880
07 834 4881


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

Affiliation with iwi and/or hapū, Ownership

Group Members


Below are all the members of Waikato Raupatu Lands Trust and Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Raukura Moana Seafoods Limited
Raukura Whare Limited
Ruakura Port Limited
Tainui Group Holdings Limited
TDL No 2 Limited
TDL No.1 Limited
TDL NO.3 LIMITED
Te Whakakitenga O Waikato Incorporated
TGH Asset Holdco Limited
Waikato Raupatu Lands Trust
loading image for pagination

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To undertake activities and operations and provide services so as to further the charitable purposes of the Waikato Raupatu Lands Trust

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Provides dividends to shareholder)

Other (please state)

(Hotel Operations)

Other (please state)

(Other beneficiaries/Waikato-Tainui beneficiaries), Children / young people, Older people, General public

Legal Structure

Company

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Pierre Charles Tohe Director 9/09/2024
Richard John Jefferies Director 25/07/2022

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Christopher John Joblin Director 9/09/2024
Andre Lyndon Settle Director 25/07/2022
Tama William Potaka Director 9/01/2017
Michael Eric Pohio Director 14/04/2015
Nathan James York Director 22/02/2010
Hinerangi Ada Raumati Director 14/10/2009

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
11/09/2024 NOC017
22/08/2022 NOC014
11/09/2017 NOC008
23/04/2015 NOC006
4/12/2012 NOC003
25/09/2012 AR004
21/05/2010 NOC002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.