Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Waikato Raupatu Lands Trust
CC43066
N/A
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 19295
Hamilton
3244
6 Bryce Street
Hamilton Central
Hamilton
3204

Charity's other details

07 834 4880
07 834 4881


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

Affiliation with iwi and/or hapū, Ownership

Group Members


Below are all the members of Waikato Raupatu Lands Trust and Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Raukura Moana Seafoods Limited
Raukura Whare Limited
Ruakura Port Limited
Tainui Group Holdings Limited
TDL No 2 Limited
TDL No.1 Limited
TDL NO.3 LIMITED
Te Whakakitenga O Waikato Incorporated
TGH Asset Holdco Limited
Waikato Raupatu Lands Trust
loading image for pagination

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

a) In respect of members of Waikato: i) promotes the relief of aged or poor members or those suffering from mental or physical sickness or disability or incapacity; or ii) is for the advancement of their education or learning; or iii) promotes their mental or physical well being; or b) promotes the educational, spiritual, economic, social or cultural advancement of the iwi of Waikato and its various hapuu including the provision of facilities for recreation or other leisure time occupations; or c) otherwise is for the benefit of Waikato

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Education and Marae Grants

Other (please state)

(Tribal Administration), Education / training / research, Health, Environment / conservation, Community development, Arts / culture / heritage, Economic development

Other (please state)

(Waikato-Tainui Beneficiaries), Children / young people, Older people, General public

Legal Structure

Organisation established under other legislation (e.g. under the Community Trusts Act 1999)

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Craig Mathew Barrett Trustee 13/01/2024
Ngatitahinga Wilson Deputy Chairperson 13/01/2024
Tipa Mahuta Chairperson 13/01/2024
Vince George Hapi Trustee 13/01/2024
Huirama Paimarire Matatahi Trustee 14/04/2021
Maxine Sheree Graham Trustee 23/01/2021
Niel Ngira Laird Simmonds Trustee 23/01/2021
Tori Ngataki Trustee 23/01/2021
Tukoroirangi Ben Morgan Trustee 23/01/2021
Donna Liarne Flavell Chief Executive Officer 16/09/2017
loading image for pagination

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Donald Aminiasi Paul Turner Trustee 13/01/2024
Rangitamoana Wilson Trustee 13/01/2024
Te Ikimoke Kristian Raimona Tamaki-Takerei Trustee 13/01/2024
Vanessa Ngaroimata Clark Trustee 13/01/2024
Aubrey Taonui Te Kanawa Trustee 23/01/2021
Edward Hoki-Mai Chong Trustee 23/01/2021
Hemi Rau Trustee 23/01/2021
Karen Akamiria Wilson Trustee 23/01/2021
Orangi Patience Te Ao Trustee 23/01/2021
Rukumoana Schaafhausen Trustee 23/01/2021
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
13/02/2023 NOC028
23/09/2020 NOC025
28/03/2019 NOC021
2/10/2017 NOC019
11/09/2017 NOC017
27/07/2015 NOC014
23/07/2015 NOC013
23/07/2015 NOC012
16/07/2015 NOC011
30/09/2013 AR006
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.