Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Ruakura Port Limited
CC51502
9429030869882
Registered

Registration details

31/03/2015
March 31

Name change history

Name Effective Date
Ruakura Limited 31/03/2015
Ruakura Port Limited 27/10/2021

Address for service

PO Box 19295
Hamilton
3244
6 Bryce Street
Hamilton Central
Hamilton
3204

Charity's other details

07 8344880


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

Affiliation with iwi and/or hapū, Ownership

Group Members


Below are all the members of Waikato Raupatu Lands Trust and Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Raukura Moana Seafoods Limited
Raukura Whare Limited
Ruakura Port Limited
Tainui Group Holdings Limited
TDL No 2 Limited
TDL No.1 Limited
TDL NO.3 LIMITED
Te Whakakitenga O Waikato Incorporated
TGH Asset Holdco Limited
Waikato Raupatu Lands Trust
loading image for pagination

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To undertake activities and operations and provide services so as to further the charitable purposes of the Waikato Raupatu Lands Trust.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Property development)

Economic development

Community development, Employment

Other (please state)

(Waikato Tainui)

Legal Structure

Company

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Pierre Charles Tohe Director 9/09/2024
Richard John Jefferies Director 25/07/2022

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Christopher John Joblin Director 9/09/2024
Andre Lyndon Settle Director 25/07/2022
Tama William Potaka Director 9/01/2017
Michael Eric Pohio Director 14/04/2015

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
11/09/2024 NOC014
22/08/2022 NOC011
3/06/2022 NOC010
11/09/2017 NOC004
11/09/2017 NOC003
23/04/2015 NOC001

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.