Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Tainui Group Holdings Limited
CC43082
9429037887322
Registered

Registration details

4/09/2008
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 19295
Hamilton
3244
6 Bryce Street
Hamilton Central
Hamilton
3204

Charity's other details

07 834 4880


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

Affiliation with iwi and/or hapū, Ownership

Group Members


Below are all the members of Waikato Raupatu Lands Trust and Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Raukura Moana Seafoods Limited
Raukura Whare Limited
Ruakura Port Limited
Tainui Group Holdings Limited
TDL No 2 Limited
TDL No.1 Limited
TDL NO.3 LIMITED
Te Whakakitenga O Waikato Incorporated
TGH Asset Holdco Limited
Waikato Raupatu Lands Trust
loading image for pagination

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To undertake activites and operations and provide services so as to further the charitable purposes of the Waikato Raupatu Lands Trust

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Provides a dividend to Waikato Raupatu Lands trust)

Economic development

Accommodation / housing, Investment

Other (please state)

(Other Beneficiaries/Waikato Tainui Beneficiaries), Children / young people, Older people, General public

Legal Structure

Company

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Craig Mathew Barrett Director 22/02/2024
Rebecca Bronwen EELE Director 28/04/2021
Robert Mark Peterson Director 16/09/2020
Hinerangi Raumati-Tu'ua Director 7/11/2017
Tania Joy Te Rangingangana Simpson Director 14/11/2015

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Dean John Bracewell Director 31/03/2024
Tukoroirangi Ben Morgan Director 22/02/2024
Sir Henricus Van Der Heyden Chairperson 30/04/2021
Linda Te Aho Director 31/03/2021
Michael Nicholas Allen Director 30/04/2020
Matthew Cockram Director 21/08/2019
Hemi Rau Director 7/11/2017
Tukoroirangi Morgan Director 7/11/2017
Paki Rawiri Director 14/05/2015
John Lewis Spencer Director 30/06/2012
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
26/10/2021 NOC022
2/08/2016 NOC015
1/12/2015 NOC012
27/05/2015 NOC011
7/10/2013 NOC007
4/12/2012 NOC006
25/09/2012 AR005
1/12/2010 NOC005
29/11/2010 NOC004
11/11/2010 NOC003
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.