Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Equippers Property Trust
CC30714
9429043140725
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
December 31

Name change history

Name Effective Date
Equippers South Church 30/06/2008
Equippers Property Trust 2/06/2015

Address for service

PO Box 68455
Newton
Auckland
1145
13-15 Gladding Place
Manukau
Auckland
2104

Charity's other details

09 358 0351
09 358 0371


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of Equippers Auckland Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Auckland City Training School
Equippers Auckland Collective
Equippers Auckland Trust
Equippers Childcare Limited
Equippers Property Trust
SENZ Charitable Trust

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Equipping people for life through faith in Jesus Christ, through the provision of assets for use in religious and community services

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Religious activities

Promotion of volunteering

General public

Children / young people, Older people, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees, Religious groups

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2024 30/06/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2023 30/06/2024 30/06/2024 $5,893,472 $1,173,056 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2022 31/08/2023 8/09/2023 $1,850,721 $1,690,880 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2021 30/06/2022 31/08/2022 $1,391,197 $1,350,835 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2021 $1,724,584 $1,242,051 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2019 30/06/2020 Member of 'Equippers Auckland Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2018 30/06/2019 Member of 'Equippers Auckland Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2017 30/06/2018 Member of '' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2016 30/06/2017 30/08/2017 $324,673 $319,695 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2015 30/06/2016 30/06/2016 $261,246 $277,736 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Stephen Thomas Woodfield Trustee 12/06/2023
Rukumoana Schaafhausen Trustee 22/02/2016
Matthew Cameron Gregory Trustee 2/06/2015
Barrett Ruakere Trustee 1/02/2010
Michael Francis Cave Trustee 30/12/2006
Samuel Hamilton Monk Trustee 30/12/2006

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Bruce Hamilton Monk Trustee 31/03/2025
David McGillivray Trustee 10/06/2022
Stuart Shutt Trustee 22/02/2016
David Spencer Kent Trustee 31/12/2011
Michael Alan Randall Trustee 31/01/2010

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
16/04/2025 NOC018
16/07/2023 NOC015
16/08/2022 NOC013
22/08/2016 NOC010
25/06/2015 NOC009
2/02/2015 NOC008
1/07/2013 NOC004
27/07/2012 AR005
9/01/2012 NOC003
1/03/2010 NOC002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.