Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Equippers Childcare Limited
CC56367
9429046397272
Registered

Registration details

1/03/2019
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 97024
Manukau City
Manukau
Auckland
2241
9 Gladding Place
Manukau
Auckland
2104

Charity's other details

0800 375 437


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of Equippers Auckland Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Auckland City Training School
Equippers Auckland Collective
Equippers Auckland Trust
Equippers Childcare Limited
Equippers Property Trust
SENZ Charitable Trust

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The company is established to carry on business for charitable non-profit purposes and to directly or indirectly benefit the public of New Zealand; To advance education, specifically early childcare education; and to promote the Word of God; and to preach the Gospel of the Lord Jesus Christ; and to carry out charitable works.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides buildings / facilities / open space, Provides religious services / activities

Education / training / research

Religious activities

Children / young people

Family / whanau, Religious groups

Entity Structure

We are a Company based in Manukau Auckland, and we operate an Early Childhood Education Centre. We have a governance board comprised of five directors, at least one of whom is directly involved in day-today operations. The constitution of the company requires us to have between three and five directors. Our shares are held by another registered charity. Our constitution does not allow our funds to be distributed other than for charitable purposes.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2024 30/06/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2023 30/06/2024 27/06/2024 $2,483,224 $2,298,434 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2023 $1,931,872 $1,900,729 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2022 $1,678,844 $1,689,438 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2020 30/06/2021 29/06/2021 $1,431,729 $1,646,572 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2019 30/06/2020 Member of 'Equippers Auckland Group' group - click here to view Annual Return

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Christopher Eng Hoe Tan Director 24/07/2023
Jacob Landridge Director 15/04/2021
Grant Raynor Director 6/06/2018
Barret Ruakere Director 9/10/2017
Susan Willis-Baker Director 9/10/2017

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Keneti Apa Director 11/10/2022
Michael Cave Director 15/04/2021

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
28/09/2023 NOC005

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.