Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Auckland City Training School
Equippers College / Creative Learning Scheme
CC31571
9429042588016
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 97024
Manukau City
Auckland
2241
13-15 Gladding Place
Manukau
Auckland
2104

Charity's other details

09 261 0070
09 261 0075


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of Equippers Auckland Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Auckland City Training School
Equippers Auckland Collective
Equippers Auckland Trust
Equippers Childcare Limited
Equippers Property Trust
SENZ Charitable Trust

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Equipping people for life through the provision of education.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Educational Teaching and Training

Education / training / research

Children / young people

Older people, General public, Family / whanau, Religious groups

Entity Structure

Charitable Trust

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2024 30/06/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2023 30/06/2024 26/06/2024 $2,128,095 $2,899,135 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2023 $2,090,778 $1,995,390 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2021 30/06/2022 29/06/2022 $1,987,019 $2,029,628 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2020 30/06/2021 29/06/2021 $1,854,344 $1,821,474 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2019 30/06/2020 Member of 'Equippers Auckland Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2018 30/06/2019 Member of 'Equippers Auckland Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2017 30/06/2018 Member of '' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2016 30/06/2017 29/06/2017 $4,398,301 $4,400,282 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2015 30/06/2016 30/06/2016 $4,537,541 $4,727,164 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Stephen Thomas Woodfield Trustee 12/06/2023
Matthew Gregory Trustee 22/02/2016
Rukumoana Schaafhausen Trustee 22/02/2016
Barrett Ruakere trustee 1/02/2010
Michael Francis Cave Trustee 1/11/2005
Samuel Hamilton Monk Trustee 1/04/2001

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Bruce Hamilton Monk Trustee 31/03/2025
David McGillivray Trustee 10/06/2022
Stuart Shutt trustee 22/08/2016
David Spencer Kent Trustee 31/12/2011
Michael Alan Randall Trustee 31/01/2010

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
16/04/2025 NOC016
16/07/2023 NOC014
22/12/2016 NOC009
22/08/2016 NOC008
15/05/2013 NOC004
31/07/2012 AR005
9/01/2012 NOC003
20/06/2011 AR004
11/05/2010 AR003
1/03/2010 NOC002
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.