Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Equippers Auckland Collective
CC59279
N/A
Registered

Registration details

4/08/2021
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 97024
Manukau City
Manukau
Auckland
2241
13 Gladding Place
Manukau
Auckland
2104

Charity's other details



Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of Equippers Auckland Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Auckland City Training School
Equippers Auckland Collective
Equippers Auckland Trust
Equippers Childcare Limited
Equippers Property Trust
SENZ Charitable Trust

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To equip people for life through faith in Jesus Christ

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Religious activities

Religious groups

Entity Structure

Trustee Board

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2024 30/06/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2023 30/06/2024 2/07/2024 $11,202,238 $11,951,446 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2022 29/02/2024 10/05/2024 $11,349,746 $11,274,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2021 30/06/2022 6/09/2022 $0 $0 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Alfredo Daniele Guglielmucci Trustee 7/04/2025
Stephen Thomas Woodfield Trustee 12/06/2023
Barrett Ruakere Trustee 26/11/2019
Matthew Gregory Trustee 26/11/2019
Michael Cave Trustee 26/11/2019
Rukumoana Schaafhausen Trustee 26/11/2019
Samuel Monk Chairperson/Trustee 26/11/2019

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Bruce Monk Trustee 31/03/2025
David McGillivray Trustee 10/06/2022

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
6/05/2025 NOC006
16/04/2025 NOC005
16/07/2023 NOC002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.