Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Equippers Auckland Trust
CC37464
9429043073634
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
December 31

Name change history

Name Effective Date
Equippers Church Trust 30/06/2008
Equippers Auckland Trust 2/06/2015

Address for service

PO Box 68455
Newton
Auckland
1145
LEVEL 4
520 Queen Street
Auckland Central
Auckland
1010

Charity's other details

09 358 0351
09 358 0371


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of Equippers Auckland Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Auckland City Training School
Equippers Auckland Collective
Equippers Auckland Trust
Equippers Childcare Limited
Equippers Property Trust
SENZ Charitable Trust

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To equip people for life through faith in Jesus Christ

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Religious activities

General public

Children / young people, Older people, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees, Religious groups

Entity Structure

Charitable Trust

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2024 30/06/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2023 30/06/2024 27/06/2024 $5,971,727 $8,281,643 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2022 15/12/2023 21/12/2023 $5,918,024 $6,219,255 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2021 30/06/2022 31/08/2022 $12,961,580 $10,353,297 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2021 $10,350,712 $9,196,913 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2019 30/06/2020 Member of 'Equippers Auckland Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2018 30/06/2019 Member of 'Equippers Auckland Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2017 31/08/2018 Member of '' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2016 30/06/2017 29/09/2017 $6,779,373 $5,701,762 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2015 30/06/2016 29/06/2016 $7,367,582 $6,093,348 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Alfredo Daniele Guglielmucci Trustee 7/04/2025
Stephen Thomas Woodfield Trustee 12/06/2023
Rukumoana Schaafhausen Trustee 22/02/2016
Matthew Cameron Gregory Trustee 2/06/2015
Barrett Ruakere Trustee 1/02/2010
Michael Francis Cave Trustee 1/12/2004
Samuel Hamilton Monk Trustee 1/12/2004

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Bruce Hamilton Monk Trustee 31/03/2025
David McGillivray Trustee 10/06/2022
Rukumoana Schaafhause Trustee 22/02/2016
Stuart Shutt Trustee 22/02/2016
David Spencer Kent Trustee 31/12/2011
Michael Alan Randall Trustee 31/01/2010

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
5/05/2025 NOC021
16/04/2025 NOC020
16/07/2023 NOC017
16/08/2022 NOC015
19/08/2016 NOC012
19/08/2016 NOC011
18/08/2016 NOC010
25/06/2015 NOC009
2/02/2015 NOC008
1/07/2013 NOC004
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.