Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


YMCA Wanganui Community Trust
Nil
CC41290
9429043033164
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 622
Wanganui Mail Centre
Wanganui
4540
125 Grey Street
Springvale
Wanganui
4501

Charity's other details

0223840641


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of Y Central Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Camp Kaitoke Limited
Pilmuir Accommodation Ltd
The YMCA Palmerston North Community Trust
The Young Mens Christian Association Of Masterton Incorporated
YMCA Central Incorporated
YMCA Of Greater Wellington Charitable Trust
YMCA Wanganui Community Trust

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The YMCA Wanganui Community Trust exists to pursue the objects of YMCA Central Inc and particularly to administer for the benefit of YMCA Central such assets as are transferred to it by YMCA Central and any other assets which become assets of the YMCA Wanganui Community Trust.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Social services

Education / training / research, Community development, Employment, Sport / recreation, Fund-raising, People with disabilities

Children / young people

Other charities, Older people, People with disabilities, General public, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 31/12/2024 Member of 'Y Central Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 Member of 'Y Central Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2022 31/01/2023 Member of '' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/01/2022 31/07/2022 23/06/2022 $0 $0 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/01/2021 31/07/2021 10/06/2021 $0 $0 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/01/2020 31/07/2020 3/08/2020 $0 $2,011,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2018 30/09/2019 14/11/2019 $4,000 $202,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2017 30/06/2018 11/07/2018 $189,000 $210,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2016 30/06/2017 30/08/2017 $223,000 $217,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2015 30/06/2016 22/07/2016 $789 $614 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination
= Balance Date Change
- This Annual Return will cover 5 months from 1 February 2022 to 30 June 2022.
- This Annual Return will cover 13 months from 1 January 2019 to 31 January 2020

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Garry Spooner Trustee 1/02/2020
Grant Baker Trustee 1/02/2020
Janet Molyneux Trustee 1/02/2020
Murray Corps Chairman 5/03/1998

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
David Craig Trustee 25/05/2022
Garry Spooner Trustee 31/01/2020
John Paine Trustee 31/01/2020
Kevin Walter Ross Trustee 31/01/2020
Rowan McGregor Chairman 31/01/2020
Colin Whitlock Trustee 23/05/2018
Matthew Power Trustee 24/10/2013
Natalie Rodgers Officer 13/08/2012
Jack Bullock Board Member 29/06/2011
Judy Karaitiana Board Member 29/06/2011
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
20/12/2022 NOC023
24/06/2021 NOC021
24/06/2021 NOC020
3/06/2021 NOC018
29/07/2020 NOC016
29/08/2017 NOC010
29/08/2017 NOC009
11/07/2016 NOC007
27/08/2013 AR006
12/07/2013 NOC001
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.