Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Group Summary


Group Members


Below are all the members of Y Central Group.

The group owner is required to complete a consolidated annual return on behalf of its members. Consolidated annual return information for these members is available in the Annual Returns tab below.

Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Camp Kaitoke Limited
Pilmuir Accommodation Ltd
The YMCA Palmerston North Community Trust
The Young Mens Christian Association Of Masterton Incorporated
YMCA Central Incorporated
YMCA Of Greater Wellington Charitable Trust
YMCA Wanganui Community Trust

Group Details


Y Central Group
YMCA Central Incorporated

Registration details

Registered
24/01/2023
CC60910
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 30247
Lower Hutt
5040
67 Pilmuir Street
Boulcott
Lower Hutt
5010

Group's other details

04 568 3252
04 568 9528


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: these Annual Returns contain consolidated financial information for all members of this group.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 31/12/2024 19/12/2024 $9,422,000 $8,600,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 19/12/2023 $8,781,000 $8,752,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/01/2023 24/01/2023 $3,019,000 $3,065,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Y Central Group is committed to facilitating community wellbeing, meaningful work, sustainable planet and just world

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Makes grants to organisations (includes schools or other charities), Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides religious services / activities

Social services

Accommodation / housing, Education / training / research, Health, Environment / conservation, Community development, Employment, Religious activities, Arts / culture / heritage, Sport / recreation, Fund-raising, Disability, Promotion of volunteering

Children / young people

People with disabilities, General public, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees, Religious groups

Entity Structure

The group comprises of the incorporation (YMCA Central Inc - the Operating entity) and its controlled entities - YMCA Masterton Inc, YMCA Greater Wellington Charitable Trust, Pilmuir Accommodation Ltd, Camp Kaitoke Ltd, The YMCA Whanganui Community Trust and the YMCA Palmerston North Community Trust.

Group Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the group, for example, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
19/12/2023 NOC003

Group Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No group documents.