Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


YMCA Central Incorporated
Y Central Incorporated
CC21628
9429043055630
Registered

Registration details

6/03/2008
June 30

Name change history

Name Effective Date
The Young Men's Christian Association Of Greater Wellington Incorporated 7/03/2008
YMCA Central Incorporated 1/02/2020

Address for service

PO Box 30247
Lower Hutt
5040
67 Pilmuir Street
Boulcott
Lower Hutt
5010

Charity's other details

04 568 3252
04 568 9528


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of Y Central Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Camp Kaitoke Limited
Pilmuir Accommodation Ltd
The YMCA Palmerston North Community Trust
The Young Mens Christian Association Of Masterton Incorporated
YMCA Central Incorporated
YMCA Of Greater Wellington Charitable Trust
YMCA Wanganui Community Trust

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

We build strong kids, strong families and strong communities through investing in the next generation

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space, Education & childcare programmes

Social services

Education / training / research, Community development, Sport / recreation

Children / young people

General public, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees, Unemployed youth

Legal Structure

Incorporated Society

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 31/12/2024 Member of 'Y Central Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 Member of 'Y Central Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2022 31/01/2023 Member of '' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/01/2022 31/07/2022 31/05/2022 $7,754,000 $8,037,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/01/2021 31/07/2021 9/06/2021 $8,293,000 $7,967,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/01/2020 31/07/2020 28/07/2020 $4,886,000 $4,917,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/01/2019 31/07/2019 2/08/2019 $4,505,790 $4,471,711 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/01/2018 31/07/2018 22/06/2018 $4,262,688 $4,342,916 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/01/2017 31/07/2017 31/07/2017 $4,315,747 $4,378,011 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/01/2016 31/07/2016 22/06/2016 $4,487,991 $4,765,562 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination
= Balance Date Change
- This Annual Return will cover 5 months from 1 February 2022 to 30 June 2022.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Sam Anderson Board Director 28/06/2023
Nick Evans Board Member 14/02/2023
Richard Lloyd Board Member 3/08/2022
Christopher Russell Board Member 27/05/2021
Murray Corps Board Member 28/07/2020
Eileen Basher Board Member 7/12/2016

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Madison Flannery Board Member 31/01/2024
Marina Cook Board Member 14/12/2023
Barry Hislop Board Member 31/10/2023
Grant Baker Board Member 14/12/2022
Janet Molyneaux Board Member 3/08/2022
Joshua Peauafi Board Member 25/05/2022
David Craig Board Member 30/06/2021
Kathleen Elizabeth Miller Board Member 29/04/2021
Coral Ann Laughton Board Member 29/10/2020
Rhys Michael Barlow Director/Trustee 25/06/2020
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
19/12/2023 NOC034
15/12/2023 NOC033
24/01/2023 NOC032
20/12/2022 NOC030
20/12/2022 NOC029
10/08/2022 NOC028
10/08/2022 NOC027
27/05/2022 NOC025
24/06/2021 NOC024
24/06/2021 NOC023
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


Notices

On 26th September, the Board of the YMCA Central (cc36342) resolved to transfer governance, assets and liabilities to YMCA Greater Wellington ( CC21628). Governance of the YMCA Central Entity now sits with the YMCA Greater Wellington entity. On Feb 1st, 2020, the YMCA Greater Wellington (cc21628) will adjust its constitution and the scope (area of services) will increase to include the regions covered by Whanganui and Palmerston North. After this is complete, the YMCA Central Entity (cc36342) will dissolve.

load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.