Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Pilmuir Accommodation Ltd
CC24285
9429034055540
Registered

Registration details

12/05/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 30247
Lower Hutt
5040
67 Pilmuir Street
Boulcott
Lower Hutt
5010

Charity's other details

(04)5683252
(04)5689258


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of Y Central Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Camp Kaitoke Limited
Pilmuir Accommodation Ltd
The YMCA Palmerston North Community Trust
The Young Mens Christian Association Of Masterton Incorporated
YMCA Central Incorporated
YMCA Of Greater Wellington Charitable Trust
YMCA Wanganui Community Trust

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

We build strong kids, strong families and strong communities.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Accommodation

Accommodation / housing

Education / training / research, Community development, Sport / recreation

General public

Older people, People with disabilities, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees

Legal Structure

Company

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 31/12/2024 Member of 'Y Central Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 Member of 'Y Central Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2022 31/01/2023 Member of '' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/01/2022 31/07/2022 21/06/2022 $290,400 $71,258 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/01/2021 31/07/2021 9/06/2021 $290,000 $87,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/01/2020 31/07/2020 28/07/2020 $268,000 $97,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/01/2019 31/07/2019 5/08/2019 $290,400 $108,715 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/01/2018 31/07/2018 22/06/2018 $290,400 $100,774 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/01/2017 31/07/2017 31/07/2017 $290,400 $96,500 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/01/2016 31/07/2016 27/06/2016 $290,400 $106,452 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination
= Balance Date Change
- This Annual Return will cover 5 months from 1 February 2022 to 30 June 2022.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Eileen Basher Trust Chair 15/02/2023
Marina Cook Trustee 11/06/2020
Peter Barrett Board Member 13/05/2008

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Grant Andrew Aaron Baker Trustee 14/12/2022
Tony Hassed Board Member 27/05/2021
Rhys Barlow Chairman 18/05/2021
Tim Antric Board Member 7/12/2016
Daniel Symonds Trustee 31/03/2016
Shenagh Gleisner President Board 30/06/2014
Andy Bogacki Board Member 31/01/2014
Jon Brett Mellors Board Member 13/05/2012
Robert Mcgregor Trustee 13/05/2012
Deborah Coral-anne Hurdle Board Member 17/02/2011

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
27/11/2024 NOC021
11/04/2023 NOC020
20/12/2022 NOC019
24/06/2021 NOC017
3/06/2021 NOC014
27/06/2016 NOC009
30/06/2015 NOC008
2/07/2014 NOC007
2/07/2014 NOC006
23/07/2013 AR006
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.