Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


YMCA Of Greater Wellington Charitable Trust
CC26691
9429043141579
Registered

Registration details

26/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 30247
Lower Hutt
5040
67 Pilmuir Street
Boulcott
Lower Hutt
5010

Charity's other details

(04)568 3252
(04)568 9528


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of Y Central Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Camp Kaitoke Limited
Pilmuir Accommodation Ltd
The YMCA Palmerston North Community Trust
The Young Mens Christian Association Of Masterton Incorporated
YMCA Central Incorporated
YMCA Of Greater Wellington Charitable Trust
YMCA Wanganui Community Trust

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

We build strong kids, strong families and strong communities.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides other finance (e.g. investment funds), Renting premises

Accommodation / housing

General public

Children / young people, Older people, People with disabilities, Migrants / refugees

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 31/12/2024 Member of 'Y Central Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 Member of 'Y Central Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2022 31/01/2023 Member of '' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/01/2022 31/07/2022 31/05/2022 $0 $0 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/01/2021 31/07/2021 10/06/2021 $0 $0 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/01/2020 31/07/2020 3/08/2020 $0 $0 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/01/2019 31/07/2019 5/08/2019 $0 $0 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/01/2018 31/07/2018 25/06/2018 $0 $0 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/01/2017 31/07/2017 31/07/2017 $0 $0 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/01/2016 31/07/2016 22/06/2016 $0 $0 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination
= Balance Date Change
- This Annual Return will cover 5 months from 1 February 2022 to 30 June 2022.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Marina Cook Trustee 11/06/2020
Grant Andrew Aaron Baker Trustee 30/04/2015
Rhys Barlow Chairman 1/02/2014
Peter Barrett Trustee 8/06/2006

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Tony Hassed Board Member 27/05/2021
Daniel Symonds Trustee 31/03/2016
Shenagh Gleisner Board Member President 30/06/2014
Andy Bogacki Board Member 31/01/2014
Robert Mcgregor Trustee 13/05/2012
Jon Mellors Board Member 22/09/2011

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
20/12/2022 NOC019
31/05/2022 NOC017
24/06/2021 NOC016
3/06/2021 NOC013
22/06/2016 NOC007
30/06/2015 NOC006
2/07/2014 NOC005
12/10/2012 AR005
2/11/2011 AR004
26/11/2010 AR003
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.