Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


National Heart Foundation Of New Zealand
CC23052
9429042769408
Registered

Registration details

16/04/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 17160
Greenlane
Auckland
1546
9 Kalmia Street
Ellerslie
Auckland
1051

Charity's other details

095719191


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of NZ Heart Foundation. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Heart Health Research Trust
National Heart Foundation Of New Zealand
Trust for the Chair in Cardiovascular Studies

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To stop New Zealanders dying prematurely from heart disease and help those people with heart disease to live full and productive lives.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Sponsors / undertakes research

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy

Health

Education / training / research, Sport / recreation, Fund-raising

General public

Children / young people

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 31/12/2024 Member of 'NZ Heart Foundation' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 Member of 'NZ Heart Foundation' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 Member of 'NZ Heart Foundation' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 Member of 'NZ Heart Foundation' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 Member of 'NZ Heart Foundation' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 Member of 'NZ Heart Foundation' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 Member of 'NZ Heart Foundation' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 Member of 'NZ Heart Foundation' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2011 31/12/2011 15/11/2011 $22,338,643 $20,783,683 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2010 31/12/2010 22/11/2010 $22,419,701 $20,547,624 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Matire Louise Ngaronga Harwood Board Member 18/09/2024
Raewyn Ann Fisher Board Member 18/09/2024
Stephen Grant Anderson Board Member 29/06/2022
Clive Martin Nelson Officer 5/08/2019
Wayne Raymond Fletcher Board Member 25/07/2018
Ian Mark Simpson Officer 21/11/2016
Jim Mann Board Member 22/09/2016
Ian David Sutcliffe Board Member 26/11/2015
Gerard Patrick Devlin Officer 1/08/2014
Faye Patricia Sumner Board Member 11/07/2008
loading image for pagination

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Malcolm Legget Board Member 1/11/2024
Thomas Treacy Trustee 29/06/2022
Anthony James Duncan Executive Director 12/04/2019
Michael Benjamin Board Member 30/05/2018
Aseta Redican Board Member 24/11/2016
Mervyn John Merrilees Trustee 24/11/2016
Stewart Mann Trustee 24/11/2016
Leslie John Leadley Trustee 30/06/2016
Sarah Williams Trustee 25/11/2015
Christopher Bullen Board member 30/06/2015
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
24/06/2024 NOC032
25/02/2020 NOC027
25/11/2019 NOC026
29/08/2019 NOC025
10/04/2019 NOC023
17/01/2018 NOC021
24/11/2017 NOC020
7/12/2016 NOC018
8/12/2015 NOC016
8/08/2014 NOC015
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.