Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Pathway Trust
CC26839
9429042946823
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31

Address for service

44 Mandeville Street
Riccarton
Christchurch
8011

Charity's other details

(03)9821952
(03)3494066


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of Pathway Charitable Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Motukarara Camp Incorporated
Pathway Affordable Housing Limited
Pathway Engineering Limited
Pathway Trust

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Yes. we give people a fresh start. It's what we do and we love doing it. People needing employment or new skills, families or individuals needing accommodation and people being released from prison come to us to help them make a fresh start.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides personal support, accommodation, employment

Social services

Accommodation / housing, Education / training / research, Community development, Employment

Other (please state)

(Disadvantaged People), Children / young people, Family / whanau

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Lois Jessie Flanagan Trustee 24/02/2020
Steven John Jukes Trustee 7/05/2014
Matthew Gray Trustee 28/03/2010
Murray Kennedy Trustee/Secretary 22/03/1998

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Victor Tan Trustee 22/06/2020
Michael Goatley Trustee/Chairman 28/03/2010

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
3/08/2020 NOC017
3/06/2014 NOC009
15/08/2012 AR006
17/02/2012 AR005
14/05/2010 NOC004
26/01/2010 NOC003
21/08/2009 AR003
30/12/2008 NOC002
29/09/2008 AR002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.