Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Skills Group Foundation
n/a
CC57939
N/A
Registered

Registration details

26/03/2020
December 31

Address for service

Level 2, Building 2, The Crossing
60 Business Parade
East Tamaki
Auckland
2013

Charity's other details



Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of The Skills Organisation Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Harrington\Vaughan Academy of Hairdressing Limited
Ignite Colleges Limited
Industry Connection for Excellence Limited
Premier Institute of Education Limited
Skills Consulting Group Limited
Skills Group Employment Limited
The Skills Group Foundation
The Skills Organisation Incorporated

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Skills Group Foundation's Charitable purpose is to support and advance The Skills Organisation Incorporated ('Skills') Charitable Purposes by facilitating a focused stewardship of the Trust Fund, distribution/application of funds for the benefit of Skills' members' charitable activities, and Skills charitable purposes and other charitable purposes.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Makes grants / loans to individuals

Education / training / research

Other charities

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Kevin Ross Best Director 26/02/2025
Tim Dunlop Gibson Director 26/06/2024
Michael John Chamberlain Trustee 4/02/2020

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Cassandra Rose Crowley Trustee 26/02/2025
Ian Richard Butturini Trustee 26/06/2024
Brian James Nowell Trustee 31/05/2022

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
16/05/2023 NOC006
29/06/2022 NOC004
18/05/2021 NOC001

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.