Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Young Mens Christian Association Of Masterton Incorporated
CC29896
N/A
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 30247
Lower Hutt
5040
67 Pilmuir Street
Boulcott
Lower Hutt
5010

Charity's other details

04 568 3252
04 568 9528


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of Y Central Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Camp Kaitoke Limited
Pilmuir Accommodation Ltd
The YMCA Palmerston North Community Trust
The Young Mens Christian Association Of Masterton Incorporated
YMCA Central Incorporated
YMCA Of Greater Wellington Charitable Trust
YMCA Wanganui Community Trust

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

We build strong kids, strong families and strong communities.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides buildings / facilities / open space, Conservation programmes

Education / training / research

Environment / conservation, Community development, Sport / recreation

Children / young people

Older people, General public, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees

Legal Structure

Incorporated Society

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 31/12/2024 Member of 'Y Central Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 Member of 'Y Central Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2022 31/01/2023 Member of '' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/01/2022 31/07/2022 27/06/2022 $0 $0 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/01/2021 31/07/2021 9/06/2021 $0 $0 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/01/2020 31/07/2020 28/07/2020 $0 $0 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/01/2019 31/07/2019 12/08/2019 $0 $0 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/01/2018 31/07/2018 25/06/2018 $0 $0 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/01/2017 31/07/2017 31/07/2017 $0 $0 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/01/2016 31/07/2016 22/06/2016 $0 $0 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination
= Balance Date Change
- This Annual Return will cover 5 months from 1 February 2022 to 30 June 2022.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Marina Cook Board Member 22/04/2020
Murray Corps Board Member 17/12/2019
Eileen Basher Board Member 7/12/2016
Barry Hislop Board Member 20/10/2016
Grant Andrew Aaron Baker Board Chair 30/04/2015

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Joshua Peauafi Board Member 25/05/2022
David Craig Board Member 17/06/2021
Kathy Miller Board Member 27/05/2021
Coral Laughton Board Member 29/10/2020
Rhys Michael Barlow Board Member 25/06/2020
Joshua Peauafi Board Member 22/04/2020
Christopher Russell Board Member 5/07/2019
Athony Francis Hassed Trustee 31/12/2018
Tim Antric Chairman 7/12/2016
Daniel Symonds Board member 31/03/2016
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
19/12/2023 NOC019
20/12/2022 NOC018
24/06/2021 NOC016
3/06/2021 NOC013
5/08/2019 NOC011
22/06/2016 NOC007
30/06/2015 NOC006
2/07/2014 NOC005
17/10/2012 AR005
2/11/2011 AR004
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.