Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Te Whakakitenga O Waikato Incorporated
Te Whakakitenga O Waikato Incorporated
CC43094
9429042972006
Registered

Registration details

4/09/2008
March 31

Name change history

Name Effective Date
Waikato-Tainui Te Kauhanganui Incorporated 4/09/2008
Te Whakakitenga O Waikato Incorporated 24/03/2016

Address for service

PO Box 19295
Hamilton
3244
6 Bryce Street
Hamilton Central
Hamilton
3204

Charity's other details



Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

Affiliation with iwi and/or hapū, Ownership

Group Members


Below are all the members of Waikato Raupatu Lands Trust and Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Raukura Moana Seafoods Limited
Raukura Whare Limited
Ruakura Port Limited
Tainui Group Holdings Limited
TDL No 2 Limited
TDL No.1 Limited
TDL NO.3 LIMITED
Te Whakakitenga O Waikato Incorporated
TGH Asset Holdco Limited
Waikato Raupatu Lands Trust
loading image for pagination

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

a) To uphold, support, strengthen and protect the Kiingiitanga b) To protect, advance, develop and unify the interests of Waikato-Tainui c) To foster among the members of Waikato-Tainui and in the application of these Rules the principles of whakaiti, rangimaarie and kia tuupato and other tikanga of Waikato-Tainui d) To achieve and support the existing and future settlements of the Treaty of Waitangi/Te Tiriti o Waitangi/raupatu claims of Waikato-Tainui e) To act as trustee of the Waikato Raupatu Lands Trust established by the Lands Trust Deed f) To act as trustee of the Waikato Raupatu River Trust established by the River Trust Deed g) To do or cause to be done all such other things as the Members of Te Whakakitenga o Waikato consider necessary or desirable for the attainment of all or any of the Objects, which are consistent with the spirit and intent of the 1995 Deed of Settlement between Waikato-Tainui and the Crown, and the Trust Deeds.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Governing Body), Makes grants / loans to individuals, Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Provides advice / information / advocacy

Other (please state)

(Tribal Adminstry/Administration), Education / training / research, Health, Environment / conservation, Community development, Social services, Religious activities, Arts / culture / heritage, Economic development

Other (please state)

(Other Beneficiaries/ Waikato-Tainui Beneficiaries), Children / young people, Older people, General public

Legal Structure

Incorporated Society

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Ngatitahinga Wilson Deputy Chair Te Whakakitenga o Waikato 14/02/2024
Craig Mathew Barrett Trustee - Te Arataura member 13/01/2024
Tipa Mahuta Chairperson Te Whakakitenga o Waikato 13/01/2024
Vince George Hapi Trustee - Te Arataura member 13/01/2024
Huirama Paimarire Matatahi Trustee - Te Arataura member 23/01/2021
Maxine Sheree Graham Trustee - Te Arataura member 23/01/2021
Niel Ngira Laird Simmonds Trustee - Kaahui Ariki Representative 23/01/2021
Tori Ngataki Trustee - Te Arataura member 23/01/2021
Tukoroirangi Ben Morgan Chair Te Arataura 23/01/2021
Donna Liarne Arihia Flavell Chief Executive Officer 16/09/2017
loading image for pagination

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Donald Aminiasi Tangi Paul Turner Trustee - Te Arataura member 13/01/2024
Rangitamoana Wilson Trustee - Te Arataura member 13/01/2024
Te Ikimoke Kristian Raimona Tamaki-Takerei Deputy Chair Te Whakakitenga 13/01/2024
Vanessa Ngaroimata Clark Trustee - Te Arataura member 13/01/2024
Parekawhia Mclean Chairman 31/03/2021
Aubrey Taonui Te Kanawa Trustee 23/01/2021
Edward Hoki-Mai Chong Trustee 23/01/2021
Hemi Rau Trustee 23/01/2021
Karen Akamiria Takanini Wilson Trustee 23/01/2021
Orangi Patience Te Ao Trustee 23/01/2021
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
14/02/2024 NOC042
14/02/2024 NOC041
23/06/2023 NOC039
13/02/2023 NOC038
1/04/2022 NOC036
1/03/2021 NOC034
1/03/2021 NOC033
1/03/2021 NOC032
23/05/2019 NOC029
25/09/2018 NOC028
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.