Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The New Zealand Marist Brothers Trust Board
CC26415
9429042788720
Registered

Registration details

23/06/2008
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 24400
Royal Oak
Auckland
1345
Unit 1
381 Great South Road
Ellerslie
Auckland
1051

Charity's other details

09 5735233
09 5735247

Oceania

Fiji, Kiribati, Samoa


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of New Zealand Marist Brothers. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Association of Champagnat Marists
Champagnat Development Foundation Trust
Champagnat Marist Education Limited
Marcellin College Limited
Marist Alternative Education Limited
Marist Brothers Champagnat Trust
Sacred Heart College Hostel Limited
Sacred Heart College Limited
St Pauls College Auckland Limited
The New Zealand Marist Brothers Trust Board
loading image for pagination

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The NZ Marist Brothers Trust Board is a Catholic religious institute of Brothers and Lay whose particular mission is the Christian education of youth. The organisation provides education to children and young people in schools that come under the ownership of the NZ Marist Brothers Trust Board.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides buildings / facilities / open space, Provides religious services / activities

Education / training / research

Religious activities, International activities, Promotion of volunteering

Children / young people

General public, Religious groups

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Peter Hamilton Horide Trustee 28/02/2023
Peter Gerard Carroll trustee 26/04/2022
Kevin Patrick Wanden Trustee 23/02/2021
John Matthew Hazelman Trustee 1/01/2020
Brian Edward Clisby Trustee 12/07/2018

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Janne Margaret Pender Trustee 27/08/2024
Leo Mark Davis Trustee 27/08/2024
David George McDonald Trustee 2/06/2023
Sefo Une trustee 27/01/2023
Anthony Michael Dunleavy Trustee 23/02/2021
Peter Hamilton Horide Trustee 26/01/2021
David George Mcdonald Trustee 31/12/2019
Kevin Patrick Wanden Trustee 31/01/2019
Christopher Maney Trustee 12/07/2018
Martin Wright Pattison Trustee 12/07/2018
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
27/08/2024 NOC035
3/03/2023 NOC033
18/10/2022 NOC031
4/03/2021 NOC026
27/07/2020 NOC020
12/06/2020 NOC019
12/06/2020 NOC018
18/12/2019 NOC017
18/12/2019 NOC016
6/08/2019 NOC015
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.