Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Sacred Heart College Hostel Limited
CC26420
9429035690139
Registered

Registration details

23/06/2008
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 24400
Royal Oak
Auckland
1345
Unit 1
381 Great South Road
Ellerslie
Auckland
1051

Charity's other details

09 5735233
09 5735241


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of New Zealand Marist Brothers. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Association of Champagnat Marists
Champagnat Development Foundation Trust
Champagnat Marist Education Limited
Marcellin College Limited
Marist Alternative Education Limited
Marist Brothers Champagnat Trust
Sacred Heart College Hostel Limited
Sacred Heart College Limited
St Pauls College Auckland Limited
The New Zealand Marist Brothers Trust Board
loading image for pagination

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To provide a boarding facility for students who would not otherwise be able to attend Sacred Heart College and receive a Catholic education at the College. To provide an environment for boarding students which will promote their wellbeing in a holistic way. To provide and maintain a positive holistic education in the spirit of St Marcellin Champagnat and in the distinctive Marist philosophy of education which includes: presence, simplicity, family spirit, commitment to work in the Way of Mary, the Mother of Jesus Christ.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides religious services / activities

Education / training / research

Accommodation / housing

Children / young people

Legal Structure

Company

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Samuel Willem O'Malley Director 14/10/2024
Tony Thomas Abraham Director 1/07/2024
Kelsen Butler Director 31/01/2024
Murray William Kelly Director 4/02/2021
Terence Joseph Carter Director 3/06/2019
Michelle Tracey Olsen Director 6/03/2017

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Leo Mark Davis Director 11/10/2024
Anna Maria Ashford director 30/01/2024
Patricia Kathleen James Director 30/01/2024
Kerry Arthur Coleman Director 31/12/2023
Leo Mark Davis Director 30/06/2023
Peter Hamilton Horide Director 2/12/2020
Kevin Patrick Wanden Director 3/06/2019
James Arnott Dale Officer 21/02/2019
Kathryn Mary Harris Director 24/11/2017
MARIA BURCH OFFICER 24/11/2017
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
14/10/2024 NOC030
14/10/2024 NOC029
22/02/2024 NOC028
16/02/2024 NOC027
18/03/2022 NOC023
4/03/2021 NOC021
4/03/2021 NOC020
11/12/2020 NOC019
2/12/2020 NOC018
21/10/2015 NOC011
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.