Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Marist Alternative Education Limited
CC48679
9429031373272
Registered

Registration details

30/11/2012
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 24400
Royal Oak
Auckland
1345
Unit 1
381 Great South Road
Ellerslie
Auckland
1051

Charity's other details

+6495735233
+6495735241


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of New Zealand Marist Brothers. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Association of Champagnat Marists
Champagnat Development Foundation Trust
Champagnat Marist Education Limited
Marcellin College Limited
Marist Alternative Education Limited
Marist Brothers Champagnat Trust
Sacred Heart College Hostel Limited
Sacred Heart College Limited
St Pauls College Auckland Limited
The New Zealand Marist Brothers Trust Board
loading image for pagination

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To provide an alternate to mainstream education for those youth referred by the Educational Consortium currently based at Orewa College. This alternate education will be guided by a Marist ethos committed to education characterized by simplicity, love of work, being inspired by Mary, presence for others and family spirit.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Education), Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides religious services / activities

Education / training / research

Religious activities, Fund-raising

Children / young people

Legal Structure

Company

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 30 June 2013 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 30 June 2014.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
David John Hutcheson director 9/10/2024
Peter Michael Gordon Garrick Director 26/04/2023
David Neil Murray Director 8/12/2021
Raymund Bourke O'Connor Director 8/09/2020
Alan Geoffrey Blackie Director 6/04/2020
Colin Divane Director 1/03/2016

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Jonathan Bernard Gabriel Director 15/12/2023
Natalie Victoria Paltridge Director 14/03/2023
Catherine Mary McClintock Director 31/12/2022
Kieren John Mallon Director 8/12/2021
Gregory James Thwaite Director 6/04/2020
Bruce Gerard Drysdale Director 31/05/2019
Ruth Patricia Spelman Director 28/02/2019
Terence Gray Costello Director 1/03/2017
Sian Maree Owen Director 20/02/2017
Barry Michael Burns Director 1/02/2016
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
14/10/2024 NOC017
22/02/2024 NOC015
18/03/2022 NOC012
3/12/2020 NOC010
2/12/2020 NOC009
21/10/2015 NOC002
29/09/2015 NOC001

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.