Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Association of Champagnat Marists
CC26417
9429042697572
Registered

Registration details

23/06/2008
December 31

Name change history

Name Effective Date
Freres Maristes Trust Board 24/06/2008
Association of Champagnat Marists 31/01/2025

Address for service

PO Box 24400
Royal Oak
Auckland
1345
Flat 1
381 Great North Road
Grey Lynn
Auckland
1021

Charity's other details

09 5735233
09 5735241


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of New Zealand Marist Brothers. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Association of Champagnat Marists
Champagnat Development Foundation Trust
Champagnat Marist Education Limited
Marcellin College Limited
Marist Alternative Education Limited
Marist Brothers Champagnat Trust
Sacred Heart College Hostel Limited
Sacred Heart College Limited
St Pauls College Auckland Limited
The New Zealand Marist Brothers Trust Board
loading image for pagination

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The objects of the Association are to undertake, promote and carry out in New Zealand such religious, charitable and educational works as are directed. The main goal is to create a wider network within Catholic community. To hold funds in trust for such purposes.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Education / training / research

Religious activities

Children / young people

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Janne Margaret Pender Trustee 13/11/2018
Leo Mark Davis Trustee 13/11/2018
Brian Edward Clisby Trustee 12/07/2018
Kevin Patrick Wanden Trustee 16/12/2010
Peter Hamilton Horide Trustee 17/12/2004

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Anthony Michael Dunleavy Trustee 13/01/2025
David George Mcdonald Trustee 2/06/2023
Christopher John Maney Trustee 12/07/2018
Siaosi Ioane Trustee 12/07/2018
Terence Gray Costello Trustee 12/07/2018
Nevil Thomas Bingley Trustee 31/12/2014
Christopher John Maney Trustee 16/12/2010
Patrick Francis Dawick Trustee : Director 16/12/2010
Roger Stanley Tapp Trustee : Director 16/12/2010
Henry Isaac Spinks Trustee : Director 14/03/2009
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
31/01/2025 NOC019
21/10/2015 NOC008
16/10/2015 NOC007
24/01/2011 NOC004
28/07/2009 NOC003
19/03/2009 NOC002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.