Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


St Pauls College Auckland Limited
CC26422
9429035621225
Registered

Registration details

23/06/2008
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 24400
Royal Oak
Auckland
1345
Unit 1
381 Great South Road
Ellerslie
Auckland
1051

Charity's other details

09 5735233
09 5735241


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of New Zealand Marist Brothers. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Association of Champagnat Marists
Champagnat Development Foundation Trust
Champagnat Marist Education Limited
Marcellin College Limited
Marist Alternative Education Limited
Marist Brothers Champagnat Trust
Sacred Heart College Hostel Limited
Sacred Heart College Limited
St Pauls College Auckland Limited
The New Zealand Marist Brothers Trust Board
loading image for pagination

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To carry on or assist in carrying on and promotion of the charitable and Apostolic and religious activities of the Congregation in connection with St Paul’s College. To conduct and carry on the College as part of the mission of the Catholic Church and in conformity with Canon Law and the educational philosophy of the Marist Brothers

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Education / training / research

Religious activities

Children / young people

Legal Structure

Company

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Brendan John Lawler director 29/08/2023
Mark Samuel Bowden Director 18/03/2021
John Twomey Director 21/05/2020
John Matthew Hazelman Director 3/01/2020
Peter Brett Davis Director 15/09/2016
Terence Joseph Carter Director 28/11/2011
Janne Pender Director 26/06/2010
Warren Long Director 26/06/2010

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Leo Mark Davis Director 30/06/2023
David George Charles McDonald Director 2/06/2023
Stephen John Barclay Director 20/12/2020
Michael Andrew Director 30/06/2020
David George McDonald Director 31/12/2019
John Green Director 25/09/2018
Terence Gray Costello Director 1/03/2017
Robert Van Tiel Executive officer 16/06/2016
Edward Errol Johnston Director 21/11/2012
John Smit Director 8/08/2011
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
23/03/2021 NOC027
4/03/2021 NOC026
2/12/2020 NOC025
1/12/2020 NOC024
9/07/2020 NOC023
11/06/2020 NOC022
11/06/2020 NOC021
21/04/2020 NOC020
9/04/2020 NOC018
20/09/2016 NOC013
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.