Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Industry Connection for Excellence Limited
CC54313
9429045891533
Registered

Registration details

22/12/2016
December 31

Address for service

364 East Tamaki Road
East Tamaki
Auckland
2013

Charity's other details

0508 442 395


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of The Skills Organisation Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Harrington\Vaughan Academy of Hairdressing Limited
Ignite Colleges Limited
Industry Connection for Excellence Limited
Premier Institute of Education Limited
Skills Consulting Group Limited
Skills Group Employment Limited
The Skills Group Foundation
The Skills Organisation Incorporated

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

(a) the advancement and passing on of education and learning; (b) providing structured education and training and support solutions to stakeholders in the vocational area; (c) co-operating with and assisting the efforts of any persons working to achieve the above purposes; and (d) doing all things as in the opinion of the Board may be incidental or conducive to achieving the above purposes.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Education / training / research

General public

Legal Structure


Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2024 30/06/2025 Member of 'The Skills Organisation Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2023 30/06/2024 Member of 'The Skills Organisation Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2022 30/06/2023 Member of 'The Skills Organisation Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2021 30/06/2022 29/06/2022 $1,454,633 $1,367,532 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2021 $890,998 $986,056 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2019 30/06/2020 28/06/2020 $812,920 $635,048 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2018 30/06/2019 28/06/2019 $465,606 $436,527 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2017 30/06/2018 28/06/2018 $460,898 $189,985 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Rosanne Mary Graham Director 1/07/2022
Scott Bitchener Director 1/06/2022

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Garry Fissenden Director 30/06/2022
Alexandra Vranyac-Wheeler Director 1/06/2022
Dale Scott Lovell Director 1/06/2022
Garry Charles Ivill Director 1/06/2022
Graham Peter Jackson Director 1/06/2022
Shirley Heather Tyson Director 1/06/2022
Scott Laughton Bitchener Director 28/06/2019
Trevor James Helm Director 18/04/2019
David Bruce Strong Director 23/04/2018

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
11/07/2023 NOC010
30/04/2018 NOC003
16/04/2018 NOC002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.