Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Skills Organisation Incorporated
CC20230
9429042715894
Registered

Registration details

11/12/2007
December 31

Name change history

Name Effective Date
Eletrotechnology Industry Training Organisation 12/12/2007
The Skills Organisation Incorporated 2/08/2012

Address for service

PO Box 24469
Royal Oak
Auckland
1345
LEVEL 2. Building C, Millennium Centre,
600 Great South Road
Ellerslie
AUCKLAND
1015

Charity's other details



Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of The Skills Organisation Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Harrington\Vaughan Academy of Hairdressing Limited
Ignite Colleges Limited
Industry Connection for Excellence Limited
Premier Institute of Education Limited
Skills Consulting Group Limited
Skills Group Employment Limited
The Skills Group Foundation
The Skills Organisation Incorporated

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The general Object of The Skills Organisation, and The Skills Group, is the advancement of charitable purposes in New Zealand - and in particular the advancement of education focused on vocational education, training and learning - in connection with the various industries represented by The Skills Organisation and its Members. To that end, the specific Objects of The Skills Organisation are: Group Leadership and Oversight. Ownership of Key Assets. Benefitting Member Industries, and Facilitating Member Input.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Sponsors / undertakes research, Provides advice / information / advocacy

Education / training / research

General public

Legal Structure

Incorporated Society

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 30 June 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 30 June 2009.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Craig Norman O'Connell Director 26/06/2024
Rosanne Graham Chief Executive Officer 1/07/2022
Kevin Best Director 26/05/2022
Timothy Gibson Director 26/05/2022
Gwyn Thomas Director - Product and Delivery 10/05/2021
Bridget Ellen O'Shannessey Director 28/06/2018
Scott Bitchener Chief Financial Officer 11/04/2016
Cassandra Crowley Director 16/09/2013
Rodney Wayne De Spong Director 1/10/2012

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Philip Jones Director Delivery and International Markets 10/03/2025
Owen Swinson Director - Sales 13/12/2024
Ian Richard Butturini Director 26/06/2024
Timothy Partington Director -Digital and Technology 31/05/2024
Alexandra Vranyac-Wheeler General Manager TITO 31/01/2024
Carolyn Managh Director - Marketing 8/09/2023
Nicky Jones General Manager People & Strategy 30/09/2022
Andrew Smith General Manager Product & Technology 26/08/2022
Garry Fissenden Chief Executive Officer 30/06/2022
Helen Carter General Manager of Marketing & Business Development 30/06/2022
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
3/07/2024 NOC050
25/09/2023 NOC048
21/06/2023 NOC047
31/10/2022 NOC040
13/01/2022 NOC039
21/06/2021 NOC038
22/06/2020 NOC037
30/05/2019 NOC036
29/06/2018 NOC035
29/06/2018 NOC034
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.