Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


SENZ Charitable Trust
SENZ Training and Employment Centre
CC10455
9429043023899
Registered

Registration details

13/06/2007
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 68455
Newton
Auckland
1145
Level 4
520 Queen Street
Auckland
1010

Charity's other details

092610070
092610075


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of Equippers Auckland Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Auckland City Training School
Equippers Auckland Collective
Equippers Auckland Trust
Equippers Childcare Limited
Equippers Property Trust
SENZ Charitable Trust

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Equipping people for life through the provision of transformational employment and training programmes

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Provides education based training programmes and employment services.), Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Education / training / research

Employment, Religious activities, Sport / recreation, Fund-raising

Children / young people

General public, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

Charitable Trust

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2007 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2008.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2024 30/06/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2023 30/06/2024 30/06/2024 $2,171,986 $4,734,221 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2022 15/12/2023 21/12/2023 $2,951,226 $2,857,879 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2021 30/06/2022 5/09/2022 $4,641,750 $2,790,284 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2021 $2,529,902 $2,311,318 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2019 30/06/2020 Member of 'Equippers Auckland Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2018 30/06/2019 Member of '' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 30/11/2017 $2,065,148 $1,956,927 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 23/11/2016 $2,258,787 $2,066,648 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 10/03/2016 $2,484,211 $2,703,753 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination
= Balance Date Change
- This Annual Return will cover 18 months from 1 July 2017 to 31 December 2018.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Stephen Woodfield Trustee 12/06/2023
Matthew Gregory Trustee 22/08/2016
Rukumoana Schaafhausen Trustee 22/02/2016
Barrett Donald Ruakere Trustee 1/05/2010
Michael Cave Trustee 21/10/2008
Samuel Monk Chairman/Trustee 21/10/2008

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Bruce Monk Trustee 31/03/2025
David McGillivray Trustee 20/06/2022
Stuart Shutt Turstee 22/02/2016
David Spencer Kent Trustee 31/12/2011
Mike Alan Randall Trustee 1/05/2010
Rukomoana Schafhausen Trustee 30/09/2009
Grant Murray Hobbs Trustee Chief Executive Officer 1/06/2009
Craig Forsyth Connelly Trustee 4/05/2009
Grant Kornel Power Trustee 4/05/2009
Margaret Anne Barker Trustee 4/05/2009
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
15/04/2025 NOC023
11/07/2023 NOC020
16/08/2022 NOC018
15/06/2018 NOC016
22/08/2016 NOC013
19/08/2016 NOC012
5/06/2015 NOC011
24/10/2013 AR007
1/07/2013 NOC006
16/07/2012 NOC005
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.