Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


New Zealand Orthopaedic Association Joint Registry Trust
NZJR
CC55489
N/A
Registered

Registration details

12/02/2018
July 31

Address for service

PO Box 5545
Pipitea
Wellington
6140
39 The Terrace
Wellington Central
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details

049139891
049139890


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of The New Zealand Orthopaedic Association Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
New Zealand Orthopaedic Association Incorporated
New Zealand Orthopaedic Association Incorporated Trust
New Zealand Orthopaedic Association Joint Registry Trust
The Wishbone Trust

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

(a)Maintain and develop the New Zealand Joint Registry; (b)Promote and encourage education and research into the techniques and effects of joint replacement;(c)Collect and collate data from hospital patients undergoing joint replacement and to utilise such data for research, educational and statistical purposes and to subsidise the costs of such research and education;(d) Obtain and record information from suppliers on prosthesis use and to utilise such information for cross checking record;

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Sponsors / undertakes research

Health

General public

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
James Andrew Blackett Treasurer 6/11/2023
Joesph Fredrick Baker Secretary 6/11/2023
Alistair Rodney Maxwell Trustee 22/12/2017
Gary John Hooper Chair 22/12/2017
Richard Geoffrey Keddell Trustee 21/12/2017

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Angus Wickham Honorary Treasurer 6/11/2023
James William Taylor Trustee 6/11/2023
Nicholas Geoge Clark Trustee 29/05/2021
David Kenneth Brown Trustee 30/11/2019

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
20/03/2025 NOC009
16/11/2020 NOC004

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.