Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


St Barnabas Parochial Trust Board
CC47113
9429042736806
Registered

Registration details

29/07/2011
December 31

Address for service

283 Mount Eden Road
Mount Eden
Auckland
1024

Charity's other details

09 631 5906


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of The Diocese of Auckland Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
All Saints Church Mititai
Auckland Anglican Insurance Charitable Trust
Diocesan Trust
Kaitaia District (Parochial) Trust Board
Kohi Parish Investment Trust
Saint Marks Remuera Parochial Trust Board
St Aidan's Endowment Trust
St Andrew's Kids' Club Trust
St Barnabas Parochial Trust Board
The Diocese Of Auckland
loading image for pagination

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To aid and further the work of the Anglican Church in New Zealand in the Parish of St. Barnabas in the Diocese of Auckland

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Religious activities

Community development, Arts / culture / heritage

Religious groups

Children / young people

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Jane Brown Trustee 4/06/2024
Supriya Yata Trustee 4/06/2024
Vivienne Young Trustee 24/03/2024
Bella Boswell Trustee 19/03/2023
Scott Alexander Campbell Malcolm Trustee 7/07/2020
Jennifer Anne Mori Trustee 31/03/2019
Gillian Joan Rushton Trustee 27/03/2011
Ruth Laurel Peterson Trustee 27/03/2011

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Bruce Philip West Trustee 30/06/2024
Heather Lois West Trustee 30/06/2024
Supriya Yata Trustee 19/03/2023
Vivienne Margaret Young Trustee 19/03/2023
Jeremy Edward Warren Trustee 21/03/2021
Robert Dana Hornburg Trustee 22/09/2019
Denis John Burchill Trustee 31/03/2019
John Reid Trustee 31/03/2019
John William Reid Trustee 26/03/2017
Maureen Clare Mcnickle Trustee 26/03/2017
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
13/02/2025 NOC022
4/06/2024 NOC021
31/05/2023 NOC019
22/03/2021 NOC014
21/08/2020 NOC013
29/07/2020 NOC012
8/04/2019 NOC009
21/08/2017 NOC007
16/08/2017 NOC005
23/05/2017 NOC004
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.