Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Kaitaia District (Parochial) Trust Board
CC32612
9429042649823
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 332
Kaitaia
441
1 Panakareao Street
Kaitaia 0410
Kaitaia
0410

Charity's other details

09 408 0528
09 408 0528


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:


Group Members


Below are all the members of The Diocese of Auckland Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
All Saints Church Mititai
Auckland Anglican Insurance Charitable Trust
Diocesan Trust
Kaitaia District (Parochial) Trust Board
Kohi Parish Investment Trust
Saint Marks Remuera Parochial Trust Board
St Aidan's Endowment Trust
St Andrew's Kids' Club Trust
St Barnabas Parochial Trust Board
The Diocese Of Auckland
loading image for pagination

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To acquire, hold, manage and dispose of any real or personal property or investments to aid and further the work of the Parish of Kaitaia.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy

Religious activities

Education / training / research, Social services, Promotion of volunteering

Religious groups

Children / young people, General public, Family / whanau

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Arena Neil Walker Trustee 12/03/2023
Barbara Yvonne Stet Treasurer/Trustee 4/05/2022
Roberta Kaio Vicar Warden/Trustee 7/02/2022
Lynn Wytenbroek People Warden/Trustee 14/03/2021
Constantinos Houtas Trustee 24/06/2013

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Allen Minnell Trustee 16/03/2023
Haley Fryer Trustee 16/03/2023
Kieta Kake Trustee 16/03/2023
Robert Towl Trustee 4/05/2022
Bruce Hows Trustee 3/02/2022
Meliss Stayte Trustee 30/09/2021
Debby Curreen Trustee 1/07/2021
David Ian Senior Trustee 26/07/2020
Donna Nathan Trustee 26/07/2020
Julie Stanyon Trustee 26/07/2020
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
19/06/2024 NOC042
5/10/2023 NOC040
1/05/2023 NOC039
1/05/2023 NOC038
5/10/2022 NOC036
29/09/2022 NOC034
28/09/2022 NOC033
22/09/2022 NOC031
19/09/2022 NOC030
7/09/2022 NOC028
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.