Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Kohi Parish Investment Trust
CC31854
N/A
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
December 31

Address for service

116 Selwyn Avenue
Mission Bay
Auckland
1071

Charity's other details

021528052


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of The Diocese of Auckland Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
All Saints Church Mititai
Auckland Anglican Insurance Charitable Trust
Diocesan Trust
Kaitaia District (Parochial) Trust Board
Kohi Parish Investment Trust
Saint Marks Remuera Parochial Trust Board
St Aidan's Endowment Trust
St Andrew's Kids' Club Trust
St Barnabas Parochial Trust Board
The Diocese Of Auckland
loading image for pagination

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The 'Kohi Parish Investment Trust' is a trust in which the interest earned on capital received may be used for the benefit of 'The Anglican Parish of Kohimarama' 'The Melanesian Martyrs Memorial Church of St. Andrew.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides other finance (e.g. investment funds)

For church activities

Religious activities

Religious groups

Anglican Religion

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Jill Benton Trustee 15/05/2014
Stephen Baxter Trustee 19/04/2012

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Stephen Batstone Trustee 15/05/2014
Donald Ernest Wormald Trustee 19/04/2012
Warwick Langley Trustee 19/04/2012

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
17/08/2017 NOC006
4/08/2014 NOC005
16/08/2012 AR005
8/07/2010 AR003
11/09/2009 AR002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.