Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Group Summary


Group Members


Below are all the members of The Diocese of Auckland Group.

The group owner is required to complete a consolidated annual return on behalf of its members. Consolidated annual return information for these members is available in the Annual Returns tab below.

Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
All Saints Church Mititai
Auckland Anglican Insurance Charitable Trust
Diocesan Trust
Kaitaia District (Parochial) Trust Board
Kohi Parish Investment Trust
Saint Marks Remuera Parochial Trust Board
St Aidan's Endowment Trust
St Andrew's Kids' Club Trust
St Barnabas Parochial Trust Board
The Diocese Of Auckland
loading image for pagination

Group Details


The Diocese of Auckland Group

Registration details

Registered
29/06/2017
CC54643
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 37242
Parnell
Auckland
1151
12 St Stephens Avenue
Parnell
Auckland
1052

Group's other details

09 302 7210


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: these Annual Returns contain consolidated financial information for all members of this group.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2024 30/06/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2023 31/07/2024 29/07/2024 $39,253,000 $36,178,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2022 1/09/2023 31/08/2023 $34,373,000 $33,083,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2021 9/12/2022 7/12/2022 $32,935,000 $28,852,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2020 30/11/2021 29/10/2021 $31,725,000 $29,065,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2019 31/07/2020 21/07/2020 $31,799,000 $28,236,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2018 30/09/2019 27/09/2019 $32,316,859 $27,078,104 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2017 30/09/2018 28/09/2018 $28,458,000 $26,025,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2016 30/06/2017 24/08/2017 $28,880,000 $26,167,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Our vision is to build church communities that flourish. Our purpose is to glorify God the Holy Trinity by living beyond ourselves, knowing God, growing in Christ and shaping community for our life and work together as a Diocese and at the local church level.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Makes grants to organisations (includes schools or other charities), Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides other finance (e.g. investment funds), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Religious activities

Accommodation / housing, Education / training / research, Environment / conservation, Community development, Social services, Arts / culture / heritage, Fund-raising, Disability, Promotion of volunteering

Religious groups

Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, General public, Family / whanau, Children / young people

Entity Structure

The Auckland Diocese is one of the seven Tikanga Pakeha dioceses within the Anglican Church in Aotearoa, New Zealand and Polynesia. Representatives of the Auckland Diocese meet annually at Synod, which conducts the governance business of the Diocese. Diocesan Council administers the governance responsibilities between annual Synod sessions. Each Ministry Unit within the Diocese has its own governing body which provides governance and oversees management at a local level.

Group Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the group, for example, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
19/05/2020 NOC004

Group Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No group documents.