Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Saint Marks Remuera Parochial Trust Board
Saint Mark's Remuera Parochial Trust Board
CC33704
N/A
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
December 31

Address for service

95 Remuera Road
Remuera
Auckland
1050

Charity's other details

09 520 2258


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of The Diocese of Auckland Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
All Saints Church Mititai
Auckland Anglican Insurance Charitable Trust
Diocesan Trust
Kaitaia District (Parochial) Trust Board
Kohi Parish Investment Trust
Saint Marks Remuera Parochial Trust Board
St Aidan's Endowment Trust
St Andrew's Kids' Club Trust
St Barnabas Parochial Trust Board
The Diocese Of Auckland
loading image for pagination

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Assist the finances of the Parish of St Mark, Remuera, Auckland

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Provides other finance (e.g. investment funds), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Religious activities

Education / training / research, Community development, Social services

General public

Children / young people, Older people, Religious groups

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2024 30/06/2025 Member of 'The Diocese of Auckland Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2023 30/06/2024 Member of 'The Diocese of Auckland Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2022 30/06/2023 Member of 'The Diocese of Auckland Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2021 30/06/2022 Member of 'The Diocese of Auckland Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2020 30/06/2021 Member of 'The Diocese of Auckland Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2019 30/06/2020 Member of 'The Diocese of Auckland Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2018 30/06/2019 Member of '' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2017 30/06/2018 17/04/2019 $0 $0 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2016 30/06/2017 17/04/2019 $0 $0 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2015 30/06/2016 27/07/2016 $0 $0 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
David Robert Elliott Board Member 9/03/2025
Thomas Stronach Mc Guire Board Member 9/03/2025
Clive Couldwell Trustee 26/05/2024
Jacqueline Rae Nield Trustee 12/05/2022
FaAfuhia Michael Fia Trustee 29/04/2019
Jan Christine Cooper Hames Trustee 29/04/2019
Sylvia Kay Rosevear Trustee 29/04/2019
Christine Koefoed Trustee 17/03/2013
Elizabeth Driver Trustee 17/03/2013
Peter Allen Trustee 17/03/2013
loading image for pagination

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Clive Cauldwell Officer 26/05/2024
Jean Nichola Cuningham Christie Trustee 26/05/2024
Robert Alexander Morgan Trustee 26/05/2024
Annabelle Couldwell Trustee 16/04/2023
Clive Montgomery Cauldwell Trustee 16/04/2023
Elizabeth Holly Perry Trustee 20/03/2022
Liam Benjamin Vink Trustee 18/10/2020
Annabelle Couldwell 15/3/2015 29/04/2019
Clive Montgomery Couldwell Trustee 29/04/2019
Darren Woodward Trustee 12/03/2017
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
17/03/2025 NOC018
4/06/2024 NOC017
4/06/2024 NOC016
17/05/2023 NOC013
9/05/2022 NOC012
4/11/2020 NOC011
5/07/2019 NOC010
2/07/2019 NOC009
18/05/2015 NOC006
23/05/2013 AR006
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.