Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Diocese Of Auckland
The Anglican Diocese of Auckland
CC31449
N/A
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 37242
Parnell
Auckland
1151
12 St Stephens Avenue
Parnell
Auckland
1052

Charity's other details

09 302 7210


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of The Diocese of Auckland Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
All Saints Church Mititai
Auckland Anglican Insurance Charitable Trust
Diocesan Trust
Kaitaia District (Parochial) Trust Board
Kohi Parish Investment Trust
Saint Marks Remuera Parochial Trust Board
St Aidan's Endowment Trust
St Andrew's Kids' Club Trust
St Barnabas Parochial Trust Board
The Diocese Of Auckland
loading image for pagination

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To provide a vibrant, relevant, dynamic missional Church as expressed in our Five Marks of Mission.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Religious activities

Accommodation / housing, Education / training / research, Environment / conservation, Community development, Social services

Religious groups

Children / young people, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, Disadvantaged

Legal Structure

Entities your charity controls

Name CC Registration Number
The Holy Trinity Cathedral Trust for Ministry Music and Mission CC60187

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Gillian Barthorpe Diocesan Council member 7/09/2024
Jeff Caleb Odhiambo Diocesan Council member 7/09/2024
Mark Peter Hangartner Diocesan Council member 7/09/2024
Ruth Peterson Diocesan Council member 7/09/2024
David Earle Howe Diocesan Council member 2/03/2024
Anne Rosalie Walsh Diocesan Council Member 8/09/2023
Rebecca Katie Conolly Diocesan Council Member 8/09/2023
Liz Martin Diocesan Council Member 25/02/2023
Paul Jonathan Woodfield Diocesan Council Member 3/11/2022
Angela Dalton Diocesan Council Member 3/09/2022
loading image for pagination

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Elizabeth Witton Diocesan Council member 6/09/2024
Fa Afuhia Michael Fia Diocesan Council Member 6/09/2024
Megan Bowden Diocesan Council member 6/09/2024
Megan Means Diocesan Council member 6/09/2024
Valonia Lawrence Diocesan Council Member 1/02/2024
Grant Hodgson Diocesan Council member 31/08/2023
Kerry William Benton Diocesan Council Member 31/08/2023
Gendi Burwell Diocesan Council member 26/01/2023
David Earle Howe Diocesan Council Member 25/08/2022
Rebecca Conolly Diocesan Council member 25/08/2022
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
20/08/2024 NOC049
5/06/2024 NOC047
18/03/2024 NOC046
28/09/2023 NOC045
14/11/2022 NOC043
20/09/2022 NOC042
15/12/2021 NOC040
25/05/2021 NOC038
19/10/2020 NOC037
19/05/2020 NOC035
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.