Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


St Aidan's Endowment Trust
CC51585
N/A
Registered

Registration details

25/03/2015
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 37448
Parnell
Auckland
1151
Level 4
123 Carlton Gore Road
Newmarket
Auckland
1023

Charity's other details



Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of The Diocese of Auckland Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
All Saints Church Mititai
Auckland Anglican Insurance Charitable Trust
Diocesan Trust
Kaitaia District (Parochial) Trust Board
Kohi Parish Investment Trust
Saint Marks Remuera Parochial Trust Board
St Aidan's Endowment Trust
St Andrew's Kids' Club Trust
St Barnabas Parochial Trust Board
The Diocese Of Auckland
loading image for pagination

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Trustee shall hold the Capital of the Trust Fund for the religious and charitable purposes of the Anglican Parish of St Aidan's in Remuera.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Religious activities

Religious groups

Children / young people, Other charities, General public, Family / whanau

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
The General Trust Board of the Diocese of Auckland Trustee 8/12/2014

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
7/06/2024 NOC010
1/06/2017 NOC002
6/04/2017 NOC001

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.