Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Champagnat Development Foundation Trust
CC26416
9429042995753
Registered

Registration details

23/06/2008
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 24400
Royal Oak
Auckland
1345
Unit 1
381 Great South Road
Ellerslie
Auckland
1051

Charity's other details

09 5735233
09 5735241

Oceania

Fiji, Kiribati, Samoa


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of New Zealand Marist Brothers. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Association of Champagnat Marists
Champagnat Development Foundation Trust
Champagnat Marist Education Limited
Marcellin College Limited
Marist Alternative Education Limited
Marist Brothers Champagnat Trust
Sacred Heart College Hostel Limited
Sacred Heart College Limited
St Pauls College Auckland Limited
The New Zealand Marist Brothers Trust Board
loading image for pagination

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

This Trust provides education to children and young people in schools that come under the ownership of the NZ Marist Brothers Trust Board.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Education / training / research

Community development, Social services, Religious activities, International activities, Fund-raising, Promotion of volunteering

Children / young people

Religious groups

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Chrstopher John Maney Trustee 18/12/2013
Kevin Patrick Wanden Trustee 16/12/2010
Siaosi Ioane Trustee 16/12/2010
Peter Hamilton Horide Trustee : Director 24/06/2008

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
David George Mcdonald Trustee : Director 2/06/2023
Terencce Gray Costello Trustee 16/12/2022
Nevil Thomas Bingley Trustee 31/12/2014
Christopher John Maney Trustee 16/12/2010
Patrick Francis Dawick Trustee : Director 16/12/2010
Roger Stanley Tapp Trustee : Director 16/12/2010
Henry Isaac Spinks Trustee : Director 14/03/2009
Iulio Suaesi Trustee 14/03/2009

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
18/06/2018 NOC009
21/10/2015 NOC008
16/10/2015 NOC007
24/01/2011 NOC004
25/08/2009 AR002
28/07/2009 NOC003
19/03/2009 NOC002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.