Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


TGH Asset Holdco Limited
CC59543
N/A
Registered

Registration details

14/10/2021
March 31

Address for service

6 Bryce Street
Hamilton Central
Hamilton
3204

Charity's other details



Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

Affiliation with iwi and/or hapū, Ownership

Group Members


Below are all the members of Waikato Raupatu Lands Trust and Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Raukura Moana Seafoods Limited
Raukura Whare Limited
Ruakura Port Limited
Tainui Group Holdings Limited
TDL No 2 Limited
TDL No.1 Limited
TDL NO.3 LIMITED
Te Whakakitenga O Waikato Incorporated
TGH Asset Holdco Limited
Waikato Raupatu Lands Trust
loading image for pagination

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To undertake activities and operations and provide services so as to further the charitable purposes of the Waikato Raupatu Lands Trust

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Fund-raising

Other charities

People of a certain ethnic / racial origin

Legal Structure

Company

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Pierre Charles Tohe Director 9/09/2024
Richard John Jefferies Director 25/07/2022

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Christohper John Joblin Director 9/09/2024
Andre Lyndon Settle Director 25/07/2022

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
11/09/2024 NOC006
29/08/2022 NOC003
24/08/2022 NOC002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.