Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Champagnat Marist Education Limited
CC26419
9429034372791
Registered

Registration details

23/06/2008
December 31

Name change history

Name Effective Date
Marist Brothers Holdings Limited 24/06/2008
Champagnat Marist Education Limited 7/03/2024

Address for service

PO Box 24400
Royal Oak
Auckland
1345
Unit 1
381 Great South Road
Ellerslie
Auckland
1051

Charity's other details

09 5735233
09 5735241


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of New Zealand Marist Brothers. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Association of Champagnat Marists
Champagnat Development Foundation Trust
Champagnat Marist Education Limited
Marcellin College Limited
Marist Alternative Education Limited
Marist Brothers Champagnat Trust
Sacred Heart College Hostel Limited
Sacred Heart College Limited
St Pauls College Auckland Limited
The New Zealand Marist Brothers Trust Board
loading image for pagination

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The company forms an integral part of the New Zealand Marist Brothers Consolidated Group, whose mission is to deliver catholic education in New Zealand.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Education etc)

Religious activities

Accommodation / housing

Children / young people

Voluntary bodies other than charities, Religious groups

Legal Structure

Company

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Helen Elizabeth Susan Te Hira Director 28/08/2024
Jacob Matheus Wermunt Director 28/08/2024
Philip Bernard Griffiths Director 28/08/2024
Brian Edward Clisby Director 3/02/2020
Janne Margaret Pender Director 20/12/2019
Leo Mark Davis Director 20/12/2019

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
John Matthew Hazelman Director 6/02/2025
Peter Hamilton Horide Trustee : Director 6/02/2025
Anthony Michael Dunleavy Director 30/01/2024
David George McDonald Trustee : Director 2/06/2023
Christopher John Maney Director 20/12/2019
Kevin Patrick Wanden Director 20/12/2019
Siaosi Ioane Director 1/03/2017
Terence Gray Costello Director 1/03/2017
Nevil Thomas Bingley Director 31/12/2014
Christopher John Maney Director 16/12/2010
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
16/12/2024 NOC019
14/10/2024 NOC018
21/10/2015 NOC007
16/10/2015 NOC006
24/02/2011 NOC003
2/10/2008 NOC002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.