Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Marist Brothers Champagnat Trust
CC50625
N/A
Registered

Registration details

5/06/2014
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 24400
Royal Oak
Auckland
1345
Unit 1
381 Great South Road
Ellerslie
Auckland
1051

Charity's other details

09 573 5233


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of New Zealand Marist Brothers. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Association of Champagnat Marists
Champagnat Development Foundation Trust
Champagnat Marist Education Limited
Marcellin College Limited
Marist Alternative Education Limited
Marist Brothers Champagnat Trust
Sacred Heart College Hostel Limited
Sacred Heart College Limited
St Pauls College Auckland Limited
The New Zealand Marist Brothers Trust Board
loading image for pagination

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The objects of the Trust are to undertake, promote and carry out in New Zealand such religious, charitable and educational works as are directed from time to time by the Superior General of the religious congregation known as Les Freres Maristes des Ecoles (Marist Brothers of the Schools) in New Zealand. To hold funds in trust for such purposes.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides religious services / activities

Education / training / research

Social services, Religious activities, Fund-raising

Children / young people

Other charities, Older people, Religious groups

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Paul Barnett Trustee 19/06/2015
Leo Mark Davis Trustee 12/12/2014
Anthony Dunleavy Trustee 13/12/2013
Kevin Wanden Trustee 13/12/2013

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Andrew Burnett Trustee 1/01/2022
Brendan Schollum Settlor and Chairperson 19/09/2014

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
27/10/2015 NOC006
21/10/2015 NOC005
16/10/2015 NOC004
30/09/2015 NOC003

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.