Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Group Summary


Group Members


Below are all the members of Whānau Mercy Ministries Trust Group.

The group owner is required to complete a consolidated annual return on behalf of its members. Consolidated annual return information for these members is available in the Annual Returns tab below.

Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Carmel College Auckland Limited
Coolock Cottages Limited
Mercy Healthcare Auckland Limited
Mercy Hospice Auckland Limited
Mercy Hospice Services Limited
Mercy Hospital Dunedin Limited
Mercy Villas Wellington Limited
St Catherine's College Wellington Limited
St Marys College Auckland Limited
Whānau Mercy Ministries Trust
loading image for pagination

Group Details


Whānau Mercy Ministries Trust Group

Registration details

Registered
23/02/2024
CC62017
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 12135
Thorndon
Wellington
6144

Group's other details

0212707266


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: these Annual Returns contain consolidated financial information for all members of this group.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 30/09/2024 $105,420,000 $95,106,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

(a) succeeding to, and furthering, the ministries carried on by the Congregation in the fields of health, education, social and community ministries in accordance with Canon Law and the Canonical Statutes; (b) such other religious, educational and charitable work carried on by the Trustees; and (c) for any other object or purpose which is charitable according to laws of NZ that relates to relief of poverty, advancement of education or religion or beneficial to the community.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Makes grants to organisations (includes schools or other charities), Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space, Provides religious services / activities

Community development

Accommodation / housing, Education / training / research, Health, Social services, Religious activities, Fund-raising, Promotion of volunteering

General public

Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, People with disabilities, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees, Children / young people

Entity Structure

A charitable trust with a board of trustees incorporated as a charitable trust board.

Group Updates


There are no public Update Details change records for this group.

Group Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No group documents.