Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Mercy Hospice Auckland Limited
CC31621
9429036819447
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 12135
Thorndon
Wellington
6144
15 Guildford Terrace
9 New Street
Thorndon
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details

0212707266


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of Whānau Mercy Ministries Trust Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Carmel College Auckland Limited
Coolock Cottages Limited
Mercy Healthcare Auckland Limited
Mercy Hospice Auckland Limited
Mercy Hospice Services Limited
Mercy Hospital Dunedin Limited
Mercy Villas Wellington Limited
St Catherine's College Wellington Limited
St Marys College Auckland Limited
Whānau Mercy Ministries Trust
loading image for pagination

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Mercy Hospice Auckland provides a range of specialist community palliative care and hospice services for people facing life limiting illnesses, caring for them with the utmost professional skill, compassion and quality of service.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space, Provides religious services / activities

Health

Accommodation / housing, Religious activities

General public

Children / young people, Older people

Legal Structure

Company

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Catherine Anne Donley Director 1/04/2025
Una Diver Director 1/04/2025
Mark Miller Watson Director 16/10/2024
Julia van de Coolwijk Director 27/08/2024
Aaron Gibb Bryan Hockly-Hodich Director 26/02/2021
Joanna Mary Simon Director 26/02/2021
Nicholas George Francis Director 29/01/2020
Arthur Morris Director 17/02/2016
Barry Snow Director 17/02/2016
Patricia Rowe Director 25/08/2010

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Susan Keppel Director 29/07/2022
Denise Patricia Downey Director 11/05/2020
Francis Horton Tuck Director 15/04/2020
Denis Michael Wood Director 15/08/2019
Judith May Vivienne Leydon Director 17/02/2016
Margaret Mary Ward Director 21/09/2015

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
14/04/2025 NOC024
8/04/2025 NOC023
4/04/2025 NOC022
1/10/2024 NOC021
26/09/2024 NOC020
14/04/2023 NOC016
15/09/2022 NOC015
9/05/2022 NOC013
19/05/2021 NOC010
5/06/2020 NOC008
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


Notices

This entity was removed from a single entity group (CC31478) on 15 February 2024. Annual return information for the financial years up to and including the financial year ending 31 March 2023 is included in the consolidated annual returns for CC31478.

load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.