Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Whānau Mercy Ministries Trust
CC60825
N/A
Registered

Registration details

5/12/2022
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 12135
Thorndon
Wellington
6144

Charity's other details



Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of Whānau Mercy Ministries Trust Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Carmel College Auckland Limited
Coolock Cottages Limited
Mercy Healthcare Auckland Limited
Mercy Hospice Auckland Limited
Mercy Hospice Services Limited
Mercy Hospital Dunedin Limited
Mercy Villas Wellington Limited
St Catherine's College Wellington Limited
St Marys College Auckland Limited
Whānau Mercy Ministries Trust
loading image for pagination

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

(a) succeeding to, and furthering, the ministries carried on by the Congregation in the fields of health, education, social and community ministries in accordance with Canon Law and the Canonical Statutes; (b) such other religious, educational and charitable work carried on by the Trustees; and (c) for any other object or purpose which is charitable according to laws of NZ that relates to relief of poverty, advancement of education or religion or beneficial to the community.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Social services

Education / training / research, Health, Religious activities

General public

Children / young people, Older people, Family / whanau

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 Member of 'Whānau Mercy Ministries Trust Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 Member of 'Whānau Mercy Ministries Trust Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 Member of 'Sisters of Mercy Ministries New Zealand' group - click here to view Annual Return

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Catherine Mary Fyfe Trustee 27/11/2022
Charlotte Mary Cummings Trustee 27/11/2022
Denise Margaret Fox Trustee 27/11/2022
Gerald Stephen Scanlan Trustee 27/11/2022
Judith Ann Whiteman Trustee 27/11/2022
Michael Francis Quigg Trustee 27/11/2022
Philip Nitama Alexander-Crawford Trustee 27/11/2022

Charity Updates


There are no public Update Details change records for this charity.

Charity Documents


Notices

This entity was removed from a single entity group (CC31478) on 15 February 2024.

load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.