Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Carmel College Auckland Limited
CC31587
9429038092695
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31

Name change history

Name Effective Date
Carmel College, Auckland Limited 30/06/2008
Carmel College Auckland Limited 23/08/2016

Address for service

PO Box 12135
Thorndon
Wellington
6144
15 Guildford Terrace
Thorndon
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details

0212707266


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of Whānau Mercy Ministries Trust Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Carmel College Auckland Limited
Coolock Cottages Limited
Mercy Healthcare Auckland Limited
Mercy Hospice Auckland Limited
Mercy Hospice Services Limited
Mercy Hospital Dunedin Limited
Mercy Villas Wellington Limited
St Catherine's College Wellington Limited
St Marys College Auckland Limited
Whānau Mercy Ministries Trust
loading image for pagination

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The purpose of the company is to hold and maintain the buildings used by Carmel College, including planning and carrying out improvements and capital works on the property.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Provides religious services / activities

Education / training / research

Community development, Religious activities

Children / young people

Legal Structure

Company

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Chloe Alexandra Tolich Director 16/10/2024
Katherine Brenda Black Director 15/05/2024
Pravina David Singh Director 15/05/2024
Samuel David Pasley Director 15/05/2024
Bernadette Maria Stockman Director 16/08/2023
Judith Ann Whiteman Chair 8/02/2023
Kevin Peter Maloney Director 18/10/2022
Danica Rose McPhee Director 11/11/2020

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Marko Simunac Director 24/03/2025
Peter Hamilton Beckett Director 31/12/2023
Laura McKenzie Director 1/10/2023
Ian Campbell Langley Director 13/09/2023
Frances Mary Hague Director 31/12/2022
Rosemary Anne Revell Director 31/10/2022
Jacqueline Mary Farman Director 27/08/2021
Bruce Christopher Macdonald Director 11/11/2020
Elizabeth Mary De Kort Director 26/07/2019
Lynn Marie Lander Director 19/02/2019
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
4/12/2024 NOC043
1/10/2024 NOC042
25/09/2024 NOC041
18/07/2024 NOC040
13/02/2024 NOC037
18/10/2023 NOC036
16/10/2023 NOC035
18/09/2023 NOC034
16/03/2023 NOC032
16/03/2023 NOC031
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


Notices

This entity was removed from a single entity group (CC31478) on 15 February 2024. Annual return information for the financial years up to and including the financial year ending 31 March 2023 is included in the consolidated annual returns for CC31478.

load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.