Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Coolock Cottages Limited
CC31501
9429033361079
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 12135
Thorndon
Wellington
6144
15 Guildford Terrace
Thorndon
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details

0212707266


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of Whānau Mercy Ministries Trust Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Carmel College Auckland Limited
Coolock Cottages Limited
Mercy Healthcare Auckland Limited
Mercy Hospice Auckland Limited
Mercy Hospice Services Limited
Mercy Hospital Dunedin Limited
Mercy Villas Wellington Limited
St Catherine's College Wellington Limited
St Marys College Auckland Limited
Whānau Mercy Ministries Trust
loading image for pagination

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To provide affordable quality housing for older people to rent.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Accommodation / housing

Older people

Legal Structure

Company

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Bernadette Kathleen Drummond Director 16/02/2023
Erin Peter Barton Director 20/08/2019
Sharon Lesley Hyndman Chair 4/07/2017

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Catherine (Kate) Frances McMahon Director 31/12/2023
Lorraine Margaret McArthur Director 27/05/2022
Anthony Harkins Director 29/11/2019
Susan Jayne France Director 6/09/2019
Kate McMahon Director 20/08/2019
Denise Downey Director 18/09/2015
Patricia Clare Vaughan Director 18/09/2015
Reuben O'Neill Director 10/03/2015
Matthew Robert Murfitt Director 30/07/2012

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
25/09/2024 NOC028
14/04/2023 NOC024
15/09/2022 NOC023
28/08/2020 NOC017
28/08/2020 NOC016
30/09/2019 NOC015
30/09/2019 NOC014
30/09/2019 NOC013
30/09/2019 NOC012
28/06/2019 NOC010
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


Notices

This entity was removed from a single entity group (CC31478) on 15 February 2024. Annual return information for the financial years up to and including the financial year ending 31 March 2023 is included in the consolidated annual returns for CC31478.

load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.