Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


St Catherine's College Wellington Limited
CC46611
9429031491334
Registered

Registration details

23/05/2011
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 12135
Thorndon
Wellington
6144
15 Guildford Terrace
Thorndon
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details

0212707266


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of Whānau Mercy Ministries Trust Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Carmel College Auckland Limited
Coolock Cottages Limited
Mercy Healthcare Auckland Limited
Mercy Hospice Auckland Limited
Mercy Hospice Services Limited
Mercy Hospital Dunedin Limited
Mercy Villas Wellington Limited
St Catherine's College Wellington Limited
St Marys College Auckland Limited
Whānau Mercy Ministries Trust
loading image for pagination

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The purpose of the company is to hold and maintain the buildings used by St Catherine's College Wellington, including planning and carrying out improvements and capital works on the property.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Education / training / research

Community development, Religious activities

Children / young people

Legal Structure

Company

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Anna Nicholls Director 23/08/2024
Annette Gray Director 23/08/2024
Daniel McGuinness Director 23/08/2024
Mary Cook Director 23/08/2024
Melanie Smith Director 23/08/2024
Sera Vatuloka Director 23/08/2024
Emma Mulhern Director 7/10/2023
Emma Harriet Richards Proprietor Board Director 26/10/2022
Wade Joseph Hall Proprietor Board Director 26/10/2022
Michael James Geoffrey Gould Director 26/02/2021

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Kevin Lampen-Smith Director 31/03/2025
Angela Susan Elizabeth Kelly-Smith Proprietor Board Director 3/04/2024
Ivan Christopher Moss Director 30/06/2023
Louisa Jane O'Brien Director 30/06/2023
Maria Joy Nagrampa Director 25/02/2022
Stephanie Marie Kitchiing Director 26/11/2021
Julie Whenua Margaret Vidal Director 27/11/2020
Kathleen Mary Moriarty Director 23/04/2020
Catherine Mary Fyfe Director 21/08/2019
Darren John Badger Director 14/02/2019
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
4/04/2025 NOC038
10/01/2025 NOC037
8/11/2024 NOC036
27/09/2024 NOC035
16/10/2023 NOC033
16/10/2023 NOC032
16/11/2022 NOC028
16/11/2022 NOC027
16/11/2022 NOC026
16/11/2022 NOC025
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


Notices

This entity was removed from a single entity group (CC31478) on 15 February 2024. Annual return information for the financial years up to and including the financial year ending 31 March 2023 is included in the consolidated annual returns for CC31478.

load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.