Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Mercy Hospital Dunedin Limited
CC31503
9429038629600
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31

Address for service

72 Newington Avenue
Maori Hill
Dunedin
9010

Charity's other details

03 464 0107
03 464 0111


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of Whānau Mercy Ministries Trust Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Carmel College Auckland Limited
Coolock Cottages Limited
Mercy Healthcare Auckland Limited
Mercy Hospice Auckland Limited
Mercy Hospice Services Limited
Mercy Hospital Dunedin Limited
Mercy Villas Wellington Limited
St Catherine's College Wellington Limited
St Marys College Auckland Limited
Whānau Mercy Ministries Trust
loading image for pagination

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Mercy Hospital is a not-for-profit organisation which has a strong commitment to providing charitable outreach that is responsiveness to the needs of the wider community. The health, education and welfare needs of the poor and underprivileged are of particular concern. The Mercy Hospital Charities Committee oversees all funding allocations and ensures these are consistent with our Mercy Heritage and Catholic Tradition.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space, Provides religious services / activities

Health

Education / training / research, Community development, Social services, Religious activities, Fund-raising, Promotion of volunteering

General public

Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, Family / whanau, Religious groups

Legal Structure

Company

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Justine Carmel Camp Director 17/08/2022
Leanne Illingworth Director 17/08/2022
Michael Brian Collins Director 17/08/2022
Alistair Craig Wyatt Director 16/08/2017
Lauren Joy Semple Director 20/11/2013

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
David Perez Director 16/03/2025
Gordon Dean Millar-Coote Director 18/07/2023
John Francis Gallaher Director 27/01/2023
Kathleen Majella Fox Director 21/08/2021
Susan Jayne France Director 20/08/2019
Lindsay John Brown Director 31/08/2017
Malcolm Saba Farry Director 31/08/2017
Stephen George Kitch Packer Director 31/08/2017
Elizabeth Mary Fulton Director 20/04/2016
Mary Ellen Hartstonge Director 20/11/2013
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
8/04/2025 NOC029
27/01/2023 NOC023
5/01/2023 NOC022
17/08/2022 NOC021
17/08/2022 NOC020
25/08/2021 NOC016
5/06/2020 NOC014
28/06/2019 NOC012
21/03/2016 NOC008
21/03/2016 NOC007
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


Notices

This entity was removed from a single entity group (CC31478) on 15 February 2024. Annual return information for the financial years up to and including the financial year ending 31 March 2023 is included in the consolidated annual returns for CC31478.

load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.