Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


St Marys College Auckland Limited
CC31604
9429038081705
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 12135
Thorndon
Wellington
6144
15 Guildford Terrace
Thorndon
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details



Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of Whānau Mercy Ministries Trust Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Carmel College Auckland Limited
Coolock Cottages Limited
Mercy Healthcare Auckland Limited
Mercy Hospice Auckland Limited
Mercy Hospice Services Limited
Mercy Hospital Dunedin Limited
Mercy Villas Wellington Limited
St Catherine's College Wellington Limited
St Marys College Auckland Limited
Whānau Mercy Ministries Trust
loading image for pagination

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The purpose of the company is to hold and maintain the buildings used by St Mary's College Auckland, including planning and carrying out improvements and capital works on the property.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides religious services / activities

Education / training / research

Accommodation / housing, Community development, Religious activities

Children / young people

Legal Structure

Company

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Samuel Robert Errington Director 30/09/2024
Hannah Frances van Schie Director 17/09/2024
George Khoury Director 20/06/2023
Grant Thomas Fraser Director 27/11/2020
Katie Priscilla Breatnach Director 21/10/2020
Mary Elizabeth Neven Director 21/10/2020
Christopher William Thom Director 29/01/2020

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Roland James Smoldon Director 15/04/2025
Charles Francis Louis Godinet Director 11/11/2024
Shyrelle Bernice Mitchell Director 14/03/2024
Clare Patricia Goddard Proprietor Board Director 31/05/2023
Jason John McLennan Director 1/10/2022
Arjen Van Helsdingen Director 5/07/2022
Patrick Timothy Ryan Director 30/09/2021
Josephine Williams Director 9/11/2020
Leona Garchow Director 10/08/2020
Alison Frances Munro Director 11/05/2020
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
1/05/2025 NOC043
22/01/2025 NOC042
3/10/2024 NOC041
30/09/2024 NOC040
11/08/2023 NOC038
16/11/2022 NOC035
16/11/2022 NOC033
15/09/2022 NOC032
17/08/2022 NOC031
19/05/2021 NOC026
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


Notices

This entity was removed from a single entity group (CC31478) on 15 February 2024. Annual return information for the financial years up to and including the financial year ending 31 March 2023 is included in the consolidated annual returns for CC31478.

load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.