Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Korean Alliance Church of Auckland
CC40189
N/A
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
December 31

Address for service

64C Dundale Avenue
Blockhouse Bay
Auckland
600

Charity's other details

021 86 4004
09 626 0043


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of The Christian and Missionary Alliance of New Zealand Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Agape Alliance Christian Church
Blockhouse Bay Community Church
Central Christian and Missionary Alliance Church
Chinese Alliance Christian Church
Korean Alliance Church of Auckland
The Christian and Missionary Alliance of New Zealand
West Harbour Alliance Church
West Harbour Chinese Alliance Christian Church

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To reach out the good news in the Korean community to build up the next generation in Jesus Christ.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Religious activities

Education / training / research, Social services, Promotion of volunteering

Religious groups

Children / young people, Older people, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, General public, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees

Entity Structure

Chairman - Seoung Hyun Lee Trustee - Jung Hee Lee

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2024 30/06/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2023 30/06/2024 13/06/2024 $21,630 $23,677 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2023 $24,328 $29,159 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2021 30/06/2022 23/05/2022 $12,565 $5,455 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2020 30/06/2021 23/09/2021 $14,533 $14,455 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2019 30/06/2020 27/07/2020 $21,317 $25,943 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2018 31/10/2019 29/09/2019 $28,093 $22,985 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2017 30/06/2018 27/09/2018 $8 $0 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2017 $12,212 $13,120 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2015 30/06/2016 22/07/2016 $13,881 $17,943 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Jung Hee Lee Trustee 1/01/2013
Seoung Hyun Lee Committee Member 21/02/2003

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
In Ho Jong Committee Member 31/12/2015

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
30/06/2016 NOC005
5/08/2013 NOC001

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.